NORCO et al v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: TALON NORCO, RICKY NORCO and WENDY NORCO
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY and STEPHANIE CUNNINGHAM
Case Number: 2:2011cv01453
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER construing 31 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Plaintiffs' Petition for Leave to Amend Their Complaint as an appeal of 30 ORDER; Upon a review of the matters raised by the appeal, said appeal is DENIED, the order of 10/26/2012 is AFFIRMED, and the instant case is referred back to the Chief Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 1/22/13. (map)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 27 Petition for Leave to Amend Complaint. In accordance with the Magistrate Judges Act, 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), and Rule 72.C.2 of the Local Rules of Court, the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from the date of issuance of this Order to file an appeal to the District Judge, which includes the basis for objection to this Order. Any party opposing the appeal shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of service of the notice of appeal to respond thereto. Failure to file a timely notice of appeal will constitute a waiver of any appellate rights. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/26/12. (clh)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 17 Petition for Leave to Amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file a second Petition for Leave to Amend which attaches a copy of their proposed amended complaint, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Pla intiffs are advised that the claims dismissed with prejudice by Judge Lancaster in the Order docketed at ECF No. 25 may not be re-pled in the proposed amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file any response to Plaintiffs second Petition for Leave to Amend within fourteen (14) days of service of same. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 9/10/12. (clh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORCO et al v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALON NORCO
Represented By: Charles W. Garbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY NORCO
Represented By: Charles W. Garbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY NORCO
Represented By: Charles W. Garbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: J. David Ziegler
Represented By: Robert J. Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: Robert J. Marino
Represented By: J. David Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?