MENICHINO et al v. CITIBANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: LINDA MENICHINO and VINCENT MENICHINO
Defendant: CITIBANK, N.A., CITIMORTGAGE, INC., CITIBANK MORTGAGE REINSURANCE, INC, UNITED GUARANTY RESIDENTIAL INSURANCE CO, PMI MORTGAGE INSURANCE CO, GENWORTH MORTGAGE INSURANCE CORP and REPUBLIC MORTGAGE INSURANCE CO.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00058
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Lancaster
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/19/18. (bdb)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/6/17. (bdb)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/5/14. (bdb)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/13. (bdb)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER directing that, upon consideration of 103 Notice of Receivership andStay of Claims as to TRIAD GUARANTY INSURANCE CORP., since further prosecution of plaintiffs' claims against said defendant are barred by mandatory and prohibitive inju nction and no further action can be taken against this party at this time, the Clerk of Court shall mark the instant case administratively closed as to defendant TRIAD GUARANTY INSURANCE CORP. only; Nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter as to said defendant and, should further proceedings in it become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate it in the same manner as if this order had not been entered. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 2/28/13. (map)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 78 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Matthew Thomas Logue as counsel for defendant GENWORTH MORTGAGE INSURANCE CORP.. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 1/23/13. (map)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Joint MOTION to Reopen Case and Set Schedule for Re-Opened Proceedings; Clerk of the Court is directed to mark this case as open and return it to the active list; Plaintiffs shall file their Amended Complaint no later than forty-f ive (45) days from the date of this order; Defendants time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint in this action shall be within sixty (60) days of the filing of the Amended Complaint; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition(s) to Defendants' Motion(s) to Dismiss, if any, within sixty (60) days of the filing of Defendants' Motion(s) to Dismiss the Amended Complaint; Each moving Defendant, or group of Defendants, may file a Reply in Support of their Motion to Dism iss Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of Plaintiffs' Opposition; Defendants are expressly relieved of any requirement to respond to the current Complaint; Parties shall meet and confer regarding proposed dates for the f iling and briefing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, as well as dates and procedures for discovery and other pre-trial matters, including dispositive motions and expert reports and discovery and report to the Court regarding same wi thin fourteen (14) days of this Court's decision(s) on Defendants' Motion(s) to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, as appropriate, provided that nothing here shall prohibit the filing of dispositive motions, including motions for summary judgment prior thereto. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 9/10/12. (map)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER directing that, upon consideration of 43 Joint MOTION to Stay Action pending a decision by the U. S. Supreme Court in the case of First American Financial Corporation, et al. v. Denise P. Edwards, the Court will refrain from ruling on the ou tstanding motion and, in the interest of judicial economy, the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; Nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter, and should further proceedings in it become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate them by motion to the Court, submitting a copy of the Supreme Court's decision in the aforementioned case. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 3/22/12. (map)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENICHINO et al v. CITIBANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA MENICHINO
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna
Represented By: Stephen J. O'Brien
Represented By: Donna Siegel Moffa
Represented By: Amanda Trask
Represented By: Terence S. Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT MENICHINO
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna
Represented By: Stephen J. O'Brien
Represented By: Donna Siegel Moffa
Represented By: Amanda Trask
Represented By: Terence S. Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIBANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIMORTGAGE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIBANK MORTGAGE REINSURANCE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED GUARANTY RESIDENTIAL INSURANCE CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMI MORTGAGE INSURANCE CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENWORTH MORTGAGE INSURANCE CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLIC MORTGAGE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?