MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. v. LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC
Plaintiff: MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Defendant: LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00560
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Approving #36 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/13/13. (jlh)
May 10, 2013 Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Borasky, Michael)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2013. Discovery due by 7/31/2013. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 8/9/2013; Defendant's Expert Reports due by 9/9/2013; Expert Depositions to be completed by 10/11/2013. Summary Judgment due by 11/1/2013; Response to Summary Judgment due by 12/6/2013; Reply brief due by 12/20/2013. Settlement Conference set for 10/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/11/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mjl)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Amend Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/11/13. (mjl)
February 8, 2013 Filing 34 Joint MOTION For Entry of an Amended Case Management Order by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Case Management Order) (Borasky, Michael)
October 19, 2012 Filing 33 ANSWER to #25 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Borasky, Michael)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Gary McGowan is appointed as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/18/12. (jlh )
September 28, 2012 Filing 31 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. (Borasky, Michael)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Answer Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/21/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mjl)
September 20, 2012 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Counterclaim filed by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order) (Borasky, Michael) Modified on 9/21/2012. (jsp)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Order Amending Case Management Order as follows: upon request of counsel, ADR Stipulation shall be filed on or before September 28, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/19/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mjl)
September 12, 2012 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2012. (Court Reporter: NONE) (mjl)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 1/7/2013. Discovery due by 2/11/2013. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 3/11/2013; Defendant's Expert Reports due by 4/12/2013; Expert Depositions to be completed by 5/13/2013. Summary Judgment due by 6/13/2013; Response to Summary Judgment due by 7/11/2013; Reply briefs due by 8/1/2013. Status Conference set for 5/20/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5C before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/12/12. (mjl)
September 7, 2012 Filing 27 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. (Borasky, Michael)
September 7, 2012 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Borasky, Michael)
August 31, 2012 Filing 25 ANSWER abd Affirmative Defenses to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. (Douglass, Kevin) Modified on 9/4/2012. (jsp)
August 21, 2012 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC on 8/31/2012 (jsp)
August 20, 2012 Filing 24 Consent Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC Answer due from LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC on 8/31/2012. (Jameson, D.) Modified on 8/21/2012. (jsp)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 8/27/2012. A Case Management Conference has been scheduled for 9/12/2012 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/9/2012. (jlh )
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss. Counts Two and Three are therefore dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/8/2012. (jlh)
August 8, 2012 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint filed by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/8/2012. (jlh )
July 9, 2012 Filing 20 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. (McKenery, David)
July 5, 2012 Filing 19 Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition re #10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Borasky, Michael)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply Brief. Plainitff shall file Sur Reply Brief as separate document, forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/5/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mjl)
July 3, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Borasky, Michael)
June 29, 2012 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #16 Response to Motion filed by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (McKenery, David)
June 15, 2012 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint filed by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Borasky, Michael)
June 15, 2012 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition re #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Borasky, Michael)
June 4, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Matthew Jameson, III on behalf of LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. (Jameson, D.)
June 4, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin K. Douglass on behalf of LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. (Douglass, Kevin)
June 2, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #10 Motion to Dismiss, #11 Brief in Support of Motion. Brief in Opposition due by 6/15/2012 ; Response to Motion due by 6/15/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/2/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mjl)
June 1, 2012 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying Laurel Mountain Midstream, LLC, Williams Laurel Mountain, LLC, Chevron AE Resources, LLC, Williams Field Services Group, LLC, Williams Partners Operating LLC, Williams Partners, LP, The Williams Companies, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. (McKenery, David) Modified on 6/4/2012 as filer did not name all parties indicated in document. (jsp)
June 1, 2012 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. (McKenery, David)
June 1, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McKenery, David)
May 22, 2012 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due by 6/1/2012 from LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC.(jlh ) Modified on 5/24/2012. (jsp)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. Response to the Plaintiff's Complaint due by 6/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/22/2012. (jlh )
May 21, 2012 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC Answer due from LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC on 6/1/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McKenery, David)
May 16, 2012 Filing 7 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Borasky, Michael)
May 3, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC served on 4/30/2012, answer due 5/21/2012. (Borasky, Michael)
May 2, 2012 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Borasky, Michael)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Paul S. Francis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/1/2012. (jlh)
April 30, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Paul S. Francis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-2350704) by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul S. Francis, Esq., #2 Proposed Order) (Borasky, Michael)
April 30, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey K. Kwak on behalf of MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Kwak, Audrey)
April 27, 2012 Summons Issued as to LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC. (jsp)
April 27, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0315-2348144), filed by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope A, #3 Summons) (jsp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. v. LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL MOUNTAIN MIDSTREAM OPERATING, LLC
Represented By: D. Matthew Jameson, III
Represented By: Kevin K. Douglass
Represented By: David D. McKenery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Represented By: Michael R. Borasky
Represented By: Audrey K. Kwak
Represented By: Paul S. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?