ROBINSON v. FOLINO et al
Plaintiff: HARVEY MIGUEL ROBINSON, JR.
Defendant: LOUIS S. FOLINO and PETER VIDONISH
Case Number: 2:2014cv00227
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Maureen P. Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 115 MOTION in Limine filed by HARVEY MIGUEL ROBINSON, JR.; DENYING 119 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Grievance Procedure filed by PETER VIDONISH; DENYING 121 MOTION in Limine Regarding Other Mail Issues filed by PETER VIDONISH; GRANTING 123 MOTION in Limine Regarding Other Misconducts filed by PETER VIDONISH; GRANTING 125 MOTION in Limine Regarding Houser and Busanet Testimony of Retaliation filed by PETER VIDONISH, for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/10/2019. (tjw)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Summary Judgment for the reasons set forth in the Opinion. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/13/17. [A copy of this Opinion and Order was mailed to Plaintiff on this date at his address of record]. (bb)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Compel Discovery as set forth more fully in the Memorandum Order itself. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/07/16. [A copy of this Memorandum Order was mailed to Plaintiff on this day at his address of record]. (bb)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 17 Motion for Reconsideration for the reasons set forth more fully in the Memorandum itself. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/2/2014. [A copy of this Memorandum Order was mailed to Plaintiff on this date at his address of record]. (bb)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for the reasons set forth more fully in the Opinion itself and the Complaint is dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/29/2014. [A copy of this Opinion and Order was mailed to Plaintiff on this date at his address of record]. (bb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBINSON v. FOLINO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARVEY MIGUEL ROBINSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS S. FOLINO
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER VIDONISH
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?