HVIZDAK v. CITIZENS BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA et al

Plaintiff: RICHARD C. HVIZDAK
Defendant: CITIZENS BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA, RBS CITIZENS, NA, CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, NAS, ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND, KAREN D. BUDNIAK, RICHARD J. BOUDREAU & ASSOCIATES, LLC, UNIVERSAL FIDELITY LP and MERCANTILE ADJUSTMENT BUREAU
Case Number: 2:2014cv00406
Filed: March 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION & ORDER indicating that Plaintiff lacks prudential standing to bring claims; that prudential standing is non-jurisdictional; that we waive prudential standing and address merits and hold the claims to be time barred, barred by judicial esto ppel, barred by the forbearance agreement, and if not barred, claims woud dbe dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration 80 is GRANTED; the Court's 78 Opinion & Order adopting the R&R is RECALLED and REPLACED with this Opinion; the Order remanding this case is RECALLED; and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 8/6/2015. (rtw)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION & ORDER indicating that 73 Plaintiffs Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment [Pursuant to] Rule 59 is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Motion is granted to the extent Plaintiff seeks a review of our Order dismissing case and a remand to state court, DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiff's 77 MOTION to Schedule Oral Argument is DENIED as moot. The Court's 72 Memorandum Order adopting the Report and Recommendation is AMENDED to vacate dismissal of complaint and to add that the case is hereby REMANDED to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County forthwith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c). Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 7/14/15. (rtw)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 71 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement with Exhibits the Objections to the Report and Recommendation; granting 46 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; adopting 67 Report and Recommendations as the Opinion of the Court, and Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 6/18/15. (rtw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HVIZDAK v. CITIZENS BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD C. HVIZDAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Marcia L. DePaula
Represented By: Robert J. Hannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS CITIZENS, NA
Represented By: Marcia L. DePaula
Represented By: Robert J. Hannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, NAS
Represented By: Marcia L. DePaula
Represented By: Robert J. Hannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND
Represented By: Marcia L. DePaula
Represented By: Robert J. Hannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN D. BUDNIAK
Represented By: Marcia L. DePaula
Represented By: Robert J. Hannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD J. BOUDREAU & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: L. John Argento
Represented By: Michael E. Giblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL FIDELITY LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCANTILE ADJUSTMENT BUREAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?