COLE v. ENCAPERA et al
Plaintiff: JASON COLE
Defendant: RICK ENCAPERA, TERRY CHILDS, JUSTIN SCHULTZ and CALIFORNIA BOROUGH
Case Number: 2:2015cv00104
Filed: January 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER: Defendants California Borough (Borough), Terry Childs (Officer Childs), Casey Durdines (Mayor Durdines) and Rick Encapera's (Chief Encapera) motion for summary judgment 133 ; and Defendant Justin Shultzs (Officer Shultz) motion for summa ry judgment 136 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows:(1) The Borough's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in its entirety;(2) Mayor Durdines' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in its entirety;(3) Chief Encapera's motion for summary judgment is DENIED as to Plaintiff's state law claim for tortious interference with business relationships and is GRANTED in all other respects;(4) Officer Childs' motion for summary judgment is DENIED in its entirety; and(5) Officer Shultz's motion for summary judgment is DENIED in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/16/2017. (ajt)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM ORDER STRIKING re 140 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by JASON COLE, 142 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by JASON COLE. Plaintiff's amended memoranda in opposition to Defendants' motions for summary judgment due by June 9, 2017 at 5:00 p.m., and as more fully set forth in the attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/7/2017. (ajt)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re 113 MOTION to Compel Discovery of ESI filed by JASON COLE, 111 MOTION for Protective Order filed by CALIFORNIA BOROUGH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/21/2016. (ajt)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART re 108 Motion to Compel filed by JASON COLE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/16/2016. (ajt)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART re 63 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by JASON COLE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/14/2016. (ajt)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING re 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TERRY CHILDS, RICK ENCAPERA, CALIFORNIA BOROUGH, 32 Motion to Dismiss filed by JUSTIN SCHULTZ. Answer due 1/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/11/2015. (ajt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLE v. ENCAPERA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON COLE
Represented By: Richard J. Cromer
Represented By: Steven M. Toprani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK ENCAPERA
Represented By: Eric M. Brown
Represented By: Christopher P. Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY CHILDS
Represented By: Eric M. Brown
Represented By: Christopher P. Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN SCHULTZ
Represented By: Bernard P. Matthews, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA BOROUGH
Represented By: Eric M. Brown
Represented By: Christopher P. Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?