WILLIAMS v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al
Plaintiff: DAVID WILLIAMS
Defendant: CITY OF PITTSBURGH, NATHAN HARPER, JOHN DOE #1, JOHN DOE #2, JOHN DOE #3 and JOHN DOE #4
Case Number: 2:2015cv00402
Filed: March 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Arthur J. Schwab
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER re 246 Supplemental Objections filed by STEPHEN MATAKOVITCH. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 04/12/2017. (lmt)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER denying 239 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/10/2017. (lmt)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 227 Motion in Limine. The Court will permit Defendant Matakovich to testify live before the jury; however, he will testify directly from his December 29, 2015 deposition transcript, as explained more fully in the body of this Order. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/6/2017. (lmt)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER sustaining in part and overruling in part 175 Objections to Verdict Slip filed by ERIC BAKER, NATHAN AUVIL, STEPHEN MATAKOVITCH, BRENDAN NEE; sustaining in part and overruling in part 176 Objections to Proposed Final Jury Instruction s on Liability filed by ERIC BAKER, NATHAN AUVIL, STEPHEN MATAKOVITCH, BRENDAN NEE; overruling 181 Errata to 177 Objections to Proposed Final Jury Instructions on Liability filed by DAVID WILLIAMS; and overruling 182 Errata to 178 Objections to Proposed Final Jury Instructions on Damages filed by DAVID WILLIAMS. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/14/2016. (lmt)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying as moot 92 Motion in Limine; granting 93 Motion in Limine; denying 94 Motion in Limine; denying 95 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion in Limine; denying 97 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion in Limine; denying 99 Motion in Limine; granting 100 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/1/2016. (lmt)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 76 Motion in Limine; denying 78 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion in Limine; granting 85 Motion in Limine; denying 87 Motion in Limine; granting 89 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/31/2016. (lmt)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/18/2016. (lmt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID WILLIAMS
Represented By: Timothy P. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHAN HARPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?