SMITH v. PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: FRANCINE SMITH
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2015cv00528
Filed: April 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Terrence F. McVerry
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 02/17/16. (mcp)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MREMORANDUM ORDER re in camera review of claim file materials redacted pursuant to the work produce doctrine/attorney-client privilege. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 12/15/2015. (rjw)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 19 MOTION TO COMPEL AND/OR EXTEND THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE, as set forth therein. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 11/04/15. (mcp)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 8 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 05/29/15. (mcp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCINE SMITH
Represented By: Anthony J. Erlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?