MILLIGAN v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL et al
Plaintiff: RAMON LASHAWN MILLIGAN
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL, ORLANDO HARPER, ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL OVERSIGHT BOARD, ALLEGHENY COUNTY BUREAU OF CORRECTIONS, CANTEEN CORRECTIONAL SERVICES and CORIZON HEALTH SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2015cv01195
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER indicating that Defendants' motion to dismiss 83 is denied; that the report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lenihan 98 is adopted as the opinion of the Court. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/6/17. (jg)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that, for the reasons more fully stated within, it is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's Appeal 90 is denied. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/26/17. (jg)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 46 Report and Recommendations.; granting 31 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth in the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 46 ), to which no objections were filed, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 31 ) is granted and Defendants Allegheny County Jail and the Allegheny County Bureau of Corrections are dismissed from this action with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is allowed to file an amended complaint in o rder to cure the deficiencies noted in the magistrate judges Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file his amended complaint and if he fails to do so by that time then this action will be dismissed for his failure to prosecute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation is adopted as the Opinion of this Court. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is remanded back to the magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/4/2016. (smc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLIGAN v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMON LASHAWN MILLIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORLANDO HARPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL OVERSIGHT BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY BUREAU OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANTEEN CORRECTIONAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?