LOVE v. THOMPSON et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. LOVE
Defendant: BRIAN THOMPSON, WHITMAN, DEBRA K. SAUERS, MICHAEL J. MAHLMEISTER, PAUL G. THERIAULT, ERIC PERNETT, MCFADDEN and JOHN DOES NO. 1-10
Case Number: 2:2015cv01712
Filed: December 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re 106 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/26/2021. (ajt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WHITMAN, MCFADDEN, MICHAEL J. MAHLMEISTER, SHAWNESE THOMPSON, DEBRA K. SAUERS, ERIC PRENETT, JOHN E. WETZEL. Status Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Suite 10160 before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy and as more fully set forth in the attached order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/23/2019. (ajt)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying re 26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by WHITMAN, MCFADDEN, MICHAEL J. MAHLMEISTER, DEBRA K. SAUERS, ERIC PERNETT, BRIAN THOMPSON. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Superintendent Thompson and P.O. Pernett are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/23/2017. (ajt)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Memorandum Opinion: Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs complaint [ECF No. 13] is GRANTED. Plaintiff may amend his complaint, consistent with this Courts memorandum opinion, by December 19, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/28/2016. (ajt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOVE v. THOMPSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. LOVE
Represented By: Justin J. Hawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA K. SAUERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. MAHLMEISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL G. THERIAULT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC PERNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCFADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES NO. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?