BRACKEN et al v. FITZGERALD et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES BRACKEN, WILLIAM DEFORTE, WILLIAM JACKSON and PATRICK JENNINGS
Defendant: WILLIAM P. MULLEN, CHELSA WAGNER, JOHN FITZGERALD, DARREL PARKER, THE COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY CONTROLLER'S OFFICE
Case Number: 2:2016cv00171
Filed: February 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION 72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THE COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, 74 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DARREL PARKER and JOHN FITZGERALD, 69 MO TION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and WILLIAM P. MULLEN, and 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY CONTROLLER'S OFFICE and CHELSA WAGNER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/21/17. (kld)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER striking 62 Second Amended Complaint and allowing a Third Amended Complaint to be filed no later than 3/1/2017. See attachment for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/22/2017. (bap)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM ORDER GRANTING all four pending Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants: DARREL PARKER & JOHN FITZGERALD (ECF No. 28 ); THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE & WILLIAM P. MULLEN (ECF No. 30 ); THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY CONTROLLER' S OFFICE & CHELSA WAGNER (ECF No. 32 ); and THE COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY (ECF No. 35 ). The Amended Complaint (ECF No. 12 ) is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint on or before 2/21/2017. If Plai ntiffs do not comply with this deadline, all federal claims in the Amended Complaint will be dismissed with prejudice, the state law claims will be dismissed without prejudice, and the case will be marked closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/7/2017. (bap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRACKEN et al v. FITZGERALD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES BRACKEN
Represented By: Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM DEFORTE
Represented By: Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM JACKSON
Represented By: Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK JENNINGS
Represented By: Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. MULLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHELSA WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARREL PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY
Represented By: John A. Bacharach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ALLEGHENY COUNTY CONTROLLER'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?