WHITENIGHT v. ELBEL et al
Plaintiff: SHAWN LEE WHITENIGHT
Defendant: THOMAS ELBEL, PRIME CARE MEDICAL, SUSAN ROSSINO and JILL CLARK
Case Number: 2:2016cv00646
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, the Court will grant each of the Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 178 , 181 , and 185 ) as to all federal claims. The Court will not exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and these claims will be dismissed without prejudice to refiling in an appropriate state forum. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/13/2019. (sms)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 156 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Defendants filed by SHAWN LEE WHITENIGHT. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/24/2019. (sms)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 108 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/2/2018. (bsc)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting in part and denying in part re 85 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by JENIPHER PURCE, TERRI CALVERT, 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JILL CLARK, PRIME CARE MEDICAL, 46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SUSAN ROSSINO, 48 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by THOMAS ELBEL. Answers due 1/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/5/2017. (sms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITENIGHT v. ELBEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN LEE WHITENIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS ELBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN ROSSINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?