VILKOFSKY v. RUSHMORE LOAN SERVICING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FRANCIS VILKOFSKY, JR
Defendant: RUSHMORE LOAN SERVICING, LLC, SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC and U.S. BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01291
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment ( 150 and 152 ) are granted. An appropriate order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/28/19. (jg)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OPINION (details more fully stated in said Order); An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/12/18. (jg)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons stated within, the Court finds that: (1) Plaintiff has adequately pled RESPA claims against Rushmore and SLS at Counts I and III of the Second Amended Complaint, but that said claims are dismissed to th e extent that an accounting is sought as an equitable remedy; (2) Plaintiff cannot state a claim against Rushmore or SLS under the FDCPA at Counts II and IV, and same shall be dismissed; and (3) Plaintiff has failed to state a claim against USB at Co unt V pursuant to respondeat superior, and same shall be dismissed. In light of Plaintiffs attempts to establish the above claims in three separate complaints (Docket Nos. 1 ; 13 ; 57 ), in this Court's estimation, further attempts to amend Counts I and III with respect to equitable relief via an accounting, as well as all claims in Counts II, IV, and V, would be unsuccessful. Accordingly, same shall be denied with prejudice. See Phillips, 515 F. 3d at 245 46 (dismissal with prejudice is appropriate when leave to amend would be futile). An appropriate order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/14/17. (jg)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for the reasons stated within, Defendants' Motions to Dismiss ( 15 and 26 ) shall be granted, in part, and denied, in part. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/3/17. (jg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VILKOFSKY v. RUSHMORE LOAN SERVICING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCIS VILKOFSKY, JR
Represented By: John David Newborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSHMORE LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: Danielle L. Dietrich
Represented By: Jillian L. Nolan Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?