WASHINGTON v. GILMORE et al
Plaintiff: JEROME JUNIOR WASHINGTON
Defendant: SUPERINTENDENT GILMORE, CART W. SHRADER, MINDY, WITTY, BURT, FINLEY, CHEARNEY, LEWIS, DREW, MORRIS, STRICK, MEDICAL PRACTIONER'S JOHN AND JANE DOE, CARO and ZAKEN
Case Number: 2:2016cv01714
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 217 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; Motion for a New Trial and Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 05/03/2019. (jmb)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 61 ) filed by Defendants Adamson, Barbieri, Michael Bell, Burt, Caro, DiAlesandro, Drew, Finley, Superintendent Gilmore, Gould, Karfelt, Lewis, Shelly Mankey, Morris, Pritts, Schamp, Medical Director Silva, Tom Wolf, and Zaken (DOC Defendants) is GRANTED as set forth in this document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Dr. Robert Valley (ECF No. 63 ) is GRANTED, and the Second Amended Complaint against him is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wittawat Kasayapanand (Dr. Witty) (ECF No. 101 ) is GRANTED and the Second Amended Complaint against Wittawat Kasayapanand (Dr. Witty) is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Pillai and Gindin (ECF No. 92 ), which has been treated as a motion for summary judgment, is GRANTED, and judgment is entered in favor of Defendants Pillai and Gindin. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 121 ) of this Court, dated October 26, 2017, as modified herein, is adopted as the opinion of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/21/2017. (jmb)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER notifying parties that the Motion to Dismiss 92 filed by Defendants Gindin and Pillia will be treated as a Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of exhaustion of Plaintiff's administrative remedies. No later than June 8, 2017, Defenda nts Gindin and Pillia shall provide Plaintiff with all grievances and appeals or other similar documents in its possession concerning the alleged incident(s). Plaintiff may not submit requests for discovery without leave of court. Plaintiff shall have until June 22, 2017 to respond to Defendants Gindin and Pillia's Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on May 25, 2017. (kcc)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 6 Amended Complaint. After reviewing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, the Court finds that it is deficient in several respects and that it is necessary for Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint that is in compliance with the inst ructions herein. Plaintiff shall amend his complaint as described herein and file it with the Court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order then the undersigned will recommend that this action be dismissed for his failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on November 21, 2016. (kcc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASHINGTON v. GILMORE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME JUNIOR WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERINTENDENT GILMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CART W. SHRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WITTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL PRACTIONER'S JOHN AND JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZAKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?