AKAN v. SUMMERS et al
Plaintiff: AKANINYENE EFIONG AKAN
Defendant: ADAM SUMMERS, NEIL REINSFELDER, STEVEN CENTRA, RUFUS JONES and GREGORY BOSS
Case Number: 2:2017cv00089
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Forest
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION setting forth the reasons the motion to seal all judicial documents 62 will be DENIED without prejudice. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/25/2019. (kjm)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 53 MOTION for Relief of Judgment filed by AKANINYENE EFIONG AKAN, 54 MOTION for Relief of Judgment filed by AKANINYENE EFIONG AKAN. AND NOW, this 4th day of December, 2018, upon consideration of plaintiff Akaninyene Efiong Akans (&q uot;plaintiff") "Motion for Relief from Order Entered August 16, 2018," (ECF No. 53), and in accordance with the foregoing memorandum opinion, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion (ECF No. 53) IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion docketed at ECF No. 54 IS DENIED as duplicative. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/4/2018. (msp)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 49 Notice filed by AKANINYENE EFIONG AKAN, indicating that the court construes the notice as a motion for reconsideration pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) and denies the motion as untimely in accordance with the foregoing memorandum opinion. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/16/2018. (msp)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 32 , 38 , and 40 , that: plaintiff's motion to reopen time 32 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the motion to extend the time to file a motion for reconsideration IS DENIED, the motion to extend the time to file an appeal purs uant to FRAP 4(a)(6) IS GRANTED; and plaintiff's motion to compel specific performance 38 and plaintiff's motion to notify the court of crucial misrepresentation 40 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 7/30/2018. (msp)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating the allegations of the complaint show that plaintiff's § 1983 claim is barred by the applicable statute of limitations. Accordingly, defendants' motions to dismiss are granted, and plaintiff's complaint shall be dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/5/2017. (erk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AKAN v. SUMMERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKANINYENE EFIONG AKAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM SUMMERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL REINSFELDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN CENTRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUFUS JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY BOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?