CAMERON v. PA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS S.C.I. GREENE
Plaintiff: DARYL E. CAMERON
Defendant: PA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS S.C.I. GREENE
Case Number: 2:2017cv00816
Filed: June 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 61) filed by Defendants Carla Swartz, Steve Christini, Ms. Humbert, Ms. Cowan, Sgt. Gibson, Sgt. Bowlin, CO Stickly is GRANTED as to Defendants Swartz, Christini, Bowlin. and Stickly, and DENIED as to Defendants Humbert, Cowan, and Gibson; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall terminate Defendants Swartz, Christini, Bowlin. and Stickly from the case; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 86) of Magistrate Judge Lenihan, dated November 19, 2020, is adopted as the opinion of the Court.. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 12/21/20. (lck)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM ORDER - The R&R of the Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 42) is adopted as the Opinion of the Court. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (ECF No. 33) that has been converted into a Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of Plaintiffs exhaustion of administrative remedies (ECF No. 35) is granted. The Clerk of Court mark this case closed.Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/8/18. (lck)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION that Defendants' 19 MOTION TO DISMISS be granted and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint be dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 03/29/2018. (jmb)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 7 Complaint and directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order as more fully described herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on August 15, 2017. (kcc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMERON v. PA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS S.C.I. GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARYL E. CAMERON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS S.C.I. GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?