UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $28,540.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $28,540.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00940
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lew, David)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a status report as to this matter. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/7/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 US Marshal's Return as to ARREST executed on 8/14/18. (cel)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT for Arrest In Action In Rem issued (cel)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lew, David)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $28,540.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $28,540.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $28,540.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: David Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?