RILEY et al v. SOUTHSIDE SIN CITY, INC. et al

Plaintiff: TIMOTHY RILEY and JACOB SCHILLING
Defendant: MARK WELSHONSE, THE GARAGE DOOR SALOON, POLICE CHIEF JAMES K. LOFTUS, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH, POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL ROSFELD and SOUTHSIDE SIN CITY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01037
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from All Defendants, to Amended Complaint (Doc. #19 ), on or before 10/10/18. See text Order entered today. (dcd)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of Clarification re #19 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; and denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim. It is unclear to the Court whether Plaintiffs' submission qualifies as an amendment as-a-matter-of-course under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). To the extent that it does not, the Court construes it as a request for leave to amend; and, given the lack of undue prejudice and for the sake of sound judicial administration, the request is granted. Thus, the filing stands as the Amended Complaint, and Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond by 10/10/18. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Finally, the University Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #16 ) the Cross-Claim filed against them by Southside Sin City, Inc., The Garage Door Saloon, and Mark Welshonse is DENIED AS MOOT. See Yocum v. Hermick, 2013 WL 5476433, *7 (W.D. Pa. Sept. 30, 2013) (filing of amended complaint renders moot cross-claims stated in answers to original complaint). Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
September 26, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL ROSFELD, SOUTHSIDE SIN CITY, INC., THE GARAGE DOOR SALOON, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH, MARK WELSHONSE ;, filed by JACOB SCHILLING, TIMOTHY RILEY. (Peirce, Robert) Modified on 9/27/2018 to edit docket text. (ksa)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Response re #16 University Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Cross-Claim filed against them by Southside Sin City, Inc., The Garage Door Saloon, and Mark Welshonse. Consistent with the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), Cross-Claimants' response is due by 10/9/18. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, and no briefing schedule will issue. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 10/1/18. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/19/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 BRIEF in Support re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JAMES K. LOFTUS, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Engle, Jeremy)
September 19, 2018 Filing 16 Cross MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JAMES K. LOFTUS, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Engle, Jeremy)
September 17, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Document is discovery material. CORRECTION: Pursuant to the Local Rules of this Court, discovery material is not permitted to be filed. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
September 14, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS PURSUANT TO RULE 26(b), FRCP by MICHAEL ROSFELD (Uhrich, Timothy) Modified on 9/17/2018 to remove document from public view as it is discovery material. (ksa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Simon on behalf of TIMOTHY RILEY, JACOB SCHILLING. (Simon, Scott)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by the University Defendants. The University Defendants' deadline for answering or otherwise responding to the Complaint is extended until 9/26/18. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/6/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JAMES K. LOFTUS, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Engle, Jeremy)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 the University Defendants' Motion to Stay, as follows. The Court will not indefinitely stay the claims against less-than-all Defendants, especially absent the consent of the other Defendants. The University Defendants remain free to file another motion to extend their deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/5/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Stay by JAMES K. LOFTUS, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Engle, Jeremy)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by MICHAEL ROSFELD. (Uhrich, Timothy) Modified on 9/5/2018 to edit docket text. (ksa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SOUTHSIDE SIN CITY, INC. (Schneider, Paul)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH, MICHAEL ROSFELD, JAMES K. LOFTUS, and COUNTERCLAIM against TIMOTHY RILEY, JACOB SCHILLING by THE GARAGE DOOR SALOON, SOUTHSIDE SIN CITY, INC., MARK WELSHONSE. (Schneider, Paul)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by the University Defendants. The University Defendants' deadline for answering or otherwise responding to the Complaint is extended until 9/5/18. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/29/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by JAMES K. LOFTUS, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Engle, Jeremy)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy D. Engle on behalf of JAMES K. LOFTUS, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Engle, Jeremy)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH, JAMES K. LOFTUS Answer due from All Defendants on 8/29/2018. (Marcus, Jonathan) Modified on 8/15/2018 to add date answer is due. (ksa)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/9/18. (jhi)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-18-8596 with Plaintiff Copies attached: Complaint, Praecipes for Appearance (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4820863), filed by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH, JAMES K. LOFTUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RILEY et al v. SOUTHSIDE SIN CITY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK WELSHONSE
Represented By: P. Chad Schneider
Represented By: Paul C. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GARAGE DOOR SALOON
Represented By: P. Chad Schneider
Represented By: Paul C. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE CHIEF JAMES K. LOFTUS
Represented By: Jonathan D. Marcus
Represented By: Jeremy D. Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH
Represented By: Jonathan D. Marcus
Represented By: Jeremy D. Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL ROSFELD
Represented By: Timothy G. Uhrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHSIDE SIN CITY, INC.
Represented By: P. Chad Schneider
Represented By: Paul C. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY RILEY
Represented By: Robert N. Peirce, III
Represented By: Scott M. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB SCHILLING
Represented By: Robert N. Peirce, III
Represented By: Scott M. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?