SENOSKI et al v. NATIONAL CITY BANK et al

Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. SENOSKI and KENNETH A. SENOSKI
Defendant: NATIONAL CITY BANK and THOMAS M. CASTELLO
Case Number: 2:2018cv01052
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Remark: The signed certified mail card from the 9/21/18 mailing to Kenneth A. Senoski was returned to Chambers on 10/1/18. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
September 21, 2018 Remark: A letter enclosing a copy of 9 Text Order / ECF filing receipt filed on 9/20/18 were mailed via regular and certified mail to Kenneth A. Senoski on 9/21/18. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Amend/Correct and Dismissing Appeal #8 . The Motion is denied. This action was previously dismissed without prejudice for want of federal jurisdiction. The Court has carefully examined the filing at #7 and it fails to cure the jurisdictional flaws noted by the Court in its Memorandum Order at #2 . Further, the Court notes that the proposed Amendment lists as a Plaintiff "Michael J.Senoski", who has not signed any of the papers in a pro se capacity, and that the signatory on the papers filed of record is "Kenneth A. Senoski", with no denomination that he is a member of the Bar of this Court. Therefore, the papers may not be considered by the Court, in that Kenneth A. Senoski is not authorized to enter an appearance on behalf of anyone other than himself. For these reasons, and those stated at length in the Court's Order at #2 , the amendment proposed would be futile, and Leave to so Amend is denied. At the same time, an "Appeal" has been filed at #8 , citing to the statutory provisions for an appeal from a decision of a Magistrate Judge. This action has not been assigned to a Magistrate Judge in any capacity, and that filing is therefore not germane to any matter in this case, and it is therefore dismissed.. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 09/20/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Hornak, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 APPEAL to District Court by KENNETH A. SENOSKI (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption by KENNETH A. SENOSKI. (Attachments: #1 Request) (sdp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #2 Envelope) (sdp).
August 29, 2018 Remark: The signed certified mail card from the 8/23/18 mailing to Kenneth A. Senoski was returned to Chambers on 8/29/18. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
August 29, 2018 Remark: The signed certified mail card from the 8/22/18 mailing to Kenneth A. Senoski was returned to Chambers on 8/29/18. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
August 23, 2018 Remark: A letter enclosing a copy of 5 Order and ECF filing receipt filed on 8/22/18 were mailed via regular and certified mail to Kenneth A. Senoski on 8/23/18. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that #4 Proposed Order is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE based on the reasons set forth in the Court's #2 Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/22/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
August 22, 2018 Remark: A letter enclosing a copy of #2 Memorandum Order and ECF filing receipt filed on 8/20/18 were mailed via regular and certified mail to Kenneth A. Senoski on 8/22/18. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Order by KENNETH A. SENOSKI, MICHAEL J. SENOSKI. (sdp)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against THOMAS M. CASTELLO, NATIONAL CITY BANK, filed by MICHAEL J. SENOSKI, KENNETH A. SENOSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 declaration) (sdp)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that #1 Motion for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, and the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for want of federal jurisdiction. The Clerk shall mark the case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/20/18. (bdb)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KENNETH A. SENOSKI, MICHAEL J. SENOSKI. (Attachments: #1 Monthly account statement/tax forms, #2 Complaint, #3 Order for appointment of counsel, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration of Sister Berenice Petrauskas, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SENOSKI et al v. NATIONAL CITY BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. SENOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH A. SENOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CITY BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS M. CASTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?