MCNEAL v. KNORR-BREMSE AG et al
Plaintiff: JANIS MCNEAL
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC., NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC, BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC, KNORR BRAKE COMPANY LLC, WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, KNORR-BREMSE AG, RAILROAD CONTROLS L.P., RICHARD BOWIE and DOES 1-20
Case Number: 2:2018cv01087
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER setting forth the MDL procedures and scheduling a status conference for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/23/2018. (kjm)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting forth MDL procedures and scheduling a status conference for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/22/2018. (kjm)
August 16, 2018 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:18-cv-01667. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER to the Western District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Maryland Unassigned on 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Marvin J. Garbis no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Response Deadlines, filed by Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Knorr Brake Company LLC, Richard Bowie, Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/18/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINES by Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC, Richard Bowie, Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chasin, Steven)
June 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Chasin on behalf of Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC, Richard Bowie, Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC (Chasin, Steven)
June 8, 2018 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Zachary Arbitman. Directing attorney Zachary Arbitman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2018 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph H Meltzer. Directing attorney Joseph H Meltzer to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2018 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kimberly Justice. Directing attorney Kimberly Justice to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary Arbitman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7378013.) by Janis McNeal(Smith, Cyril)
June 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC, Richard Bowie, Faiveley Transport North America, Inc., Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Railroad Controls, L.P., Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph H. Meltzer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7374428.) by Janis McNeal(Smith, Cyril)
June 7, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Marvin J. Garbis. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Leigh Shelton on behalf of Janis McNeal (Shelton, Alicia)
June 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly A. Justice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7374028.) by Janis McNeal(Smith, Cyril)
June 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7374021.), filed by Janis McNeal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons [Knorr-Bremse AG], #3 Summons [Knorr Brake Company LLC], #4 Summons [New York Air Brake LLC], #5 Summons [Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC], #6 Summons [Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation], #7 Summons [Faiveley Transport North America Inc], #8 Summons [Railroad Controls LP], #9 Summons [Richard T. Bowie])(Smith, Cyril)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCNEAL v. KNORR-BREMSE AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC
Represented By: Steven Michael Chasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: Steven Michael Chasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR BRAKE COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Steven Michael Chasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR-BREMSE AG
Represented By: Steven Michael Chasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAILROAD CONTROLS L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BOWIE
Represented By: Steven Michael Chasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANIS MCNEAL
Represented By: Zachary Arbitman
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Represented By: Alicia Leigh Shelton
Represented By: Cyril Vincent Smith, III
Represented By: Kimberly Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?