ARCURI et al v. KNORR-BREMSE AG et al
Plaintiff: ASHLEY KERR and PAUL ARCURI
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC., NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC, KNORR BRAKE COMPANY LLC, WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION and KNORR-BREMSE AG
Case Number: 2:2018cv01098
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER setting forth the MDL procedures and scheduling a status conference for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/23/2018. (kjm)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting forth MDL procedures and scheduling a status conference for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/22/2018. (kjm)
August 20, 2018 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:18-cv-01191. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2018 Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the Western District of Pennsylvania. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Plaintiffs counsel to advise the court of hearing results. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/12/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Marvin J. Garbis no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Chasin on behalf of Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC (Chasin, Steven)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINES filed by Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Knorr Brake Company LLC. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/17/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINES by Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chasin, Steven)
May 4, 2018 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel C Girard. Attorney Daniel C Girard will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 4, 2018 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Adam E Polk. Attorney Adam E Polk will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel C. Girard (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7305532.) by Paul Arcuri, Ashley Kerr(Ulwick, James)
May 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam E. Polk (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7305505.) by Paul Arcuri, Ashley Kerr(Ulwick, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Paul Arcuri, Ashley Kerr (Ulwick, James)
April 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Faiveley Transport North America, Inc., Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Paul Arcuri, Ashley Kerr re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Faiveley Transport North America, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons - Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation, #3 Proposed Summons - New York Air Brake LLC, #4 Proposed Summons - Knorr Brake Company LLC, #5 Proposed Summons - Knorr-Bremse AG)(Ulwick, James)
April 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Faiveley Transport North America, Inc., Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7286349.), filed by Paul Arcuri, Ashley Kerr.(Ulwick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARCURI et al v. KNORR-BREMSE AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY KERR
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL ARCURI
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC
Represented By: Steven Michael Chasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR BRAKE COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Steven Michael Chasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR-BREMSE AG
Represented By: Steven Michael Chasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?