KUBIK et al v. FAIVELEY TRANSPORT S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Kubik, Allyn Basore and Deondra Randle
Defendant: KNORR BRAKE COMPANY, NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC, WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, FAIVELEY TRANSPORT S.A., KNORR-BREMSE AG and FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01100
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER setting forth the MDL procedures and scheduling a status conference for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/23/2018. (kjm)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting forth MDL procedures and scheduling a status conference for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/22/2018. (kjm)
August 20, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 3:18-cv-01618. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 Case transferred to Western District of Pennsylvania per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number CTO-1 for inclusion in MDL No. 2850, IN RE: RAILWAY INDUSTRY EMPLOYEE NO-POACH ANTITRUST LITIGATION. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(cbru, )
July 6, 2018 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/6/2018.(cbru, )
July 6, 2018 Filing 13 Additional Attachments to Main Document #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason S. Hartley ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7854952). First attachment description: Certificate . (Burke, Russell)
July 2, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/2/2018. (cbru, )
June 29, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Faivelely Transport North America, Inc., Faiveley Transport S.A., Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. Response to Motion due by 7/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Thiem, Jennifer) Modified to correct motion relief on 6/29/2018 (cbru, ). (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/29/2018) (cbru, ).
June 27, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/27/2018.(cbru, )
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vincent J. Esades ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7848277). First attachment description: Certificate of Good Standing Vincent J. Esades. (Burke, Russell)
June 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason S. Hartley ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7854952) by Allyn Basore, Edward Kubik, Deondra Randle. Response to Motion due by 7/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Burke, Russell) Additional attachment filed as entry #13 on 7/6/2018 (cbru, ).
June 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vincent J. Esades ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7848277) by Allyn Basore, Edward Kubik, Deondra Randle. Response to Motion due by 7/5/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Burke, Russell) Additional attachment filed as entry #9 on 6/27/2018 (cbru, ).
June 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Faivelely Transport North America, Inc., Faiveley Transport S.A., Knorr Brake Company, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. (cbru, )
June 13, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allyn Basore, Edward Kubik, Deondra Randle.(cbru, )
June 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Faivelely Transport North America, Inc., Faiveley Transport S.A., Knorr Brake Company, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7832056) filed by Allyn Basore, Edward Kubik, Deondra Randle. Service due by 9/11/2018(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUBIK et al v. FAIVELEY TRANSPORT S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Kubik
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: Russell Thomas Burke
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyn Basore
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: Russell Thomas Burke
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deondra Randle
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: Russell Thomas Burke
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR BRAKE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Represented By: Jennifer Hess Thiem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT S.A.
Represented By: Jennifer Hess Thiem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR-BREMSE AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC.
Represented By: Jennifer Hess Thiem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?