INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC v. 1518.65 TONS OF FRAC SAND ABOARD BARGE IN135442
Plaintiff: INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC
Defendant: 1518.65 TONS OF FRAC SAND ABOARD BARGE IN135442
Case Number: 2:2018cv01113
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 PROOF of Publication filed by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC. Name of publication: Pittsburgh Legal Journal. Last publication date October 9th, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Veith, Laura )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Service by Publication of Notice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/21/18. (eca)
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Service by Publication of Notice by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Publication) (Veith, Laura )
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 US Marshal's Return of Arrest in in Rem posting on Barge on 8/31/2018 per #6 ORDER. (jv)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE Certificate of Mailing and Email Transmittal by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC re #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian, #5 Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hines, Julius)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Julius H. Hines to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 08/29/18. (eca)
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Order re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC. (Hines, Julius)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that, to the extent that Attorney Hines wishes to seek pro hac vice admission to practice before this Court, he is to familiarize himself with the Local Rules. Specifically, Local Rule 7.D. requires that all motions must be accompanied by a proposed order of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 8/28/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Julius H. Hines to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4840663) by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Hines, Julius)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 Issuance of Warrant in rem. (sdp) Modified on 8/28/2018. (jv)
August 27, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant for Arrest) (Veith, Laura )
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Industry Terminal & Salvage Co. appointed. Plaintiff is directed to immediately fax and ship by an overnight service a copy of this Order to Sand Technologies, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 8/24/18. (ard)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Plaintiff is directed to immediately fax and ship by an overnight service a copy of this Order to Sand Technologies, LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 8/24/18. (ard)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian Substitute by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order) (Veith, Laura )
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem for Arrest by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Veith, Laura )
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement re #1 Complaint identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC. (jv)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1518.65 TONS OF FRAC SAND ABOARD BARGE IN135442 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4836067), filed by INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC v. 1518.65 TONS OF FRAC SAND ABOARD BARGE IN135442
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1518.65 TONS OF FRAC SAND ABOARD BARGE IN135442
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGRAM BARGE COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Laura K. Veith
Represented By: Julius H. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?