BUNDICK et al v. OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC

Plaintiff: CARMEN BUNDICK and ARTHUR BUNDICK
Defendant: OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01121
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Thai, Amanda)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Suite 10160 before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 10/24/2018; Rule 26 Meeting Report, Proposed Case Management Order, ADR Stipulation, and Confidential Position Letters due by 11/9/2018 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/9/2018. (sms)
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Thai, Amanda)
October 8, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by CARMEN BUNDICK. (Kirleis, Alyson)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Leary, Paul)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Amanda W. Thai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/26/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Paul K. Leary, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/26/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Amanda W. Thai to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4875365) by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Thai, Amanda)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Paul K. Leary, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4875346) by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Leary, Paul)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw #2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/12/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, Brief in Support of Motion by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Lee, Gabrielle)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 10/1/2018, each party shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/31/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. Plaintiffs shall file a Response to the motion by 10/1/2018. Defendant shall file a Reply by 10/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/31/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
August 31, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Motion to Dismiss. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
August 30, 2018 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. No Document attached; filed with #2 (dm)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order) (Lee, Gabrielle)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD 18-6080 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4837499), filed by OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUNDICK et al v. OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC
Represented By: Gabrielle I. Lee
Represented By: Paul K. Leary, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN BUNDICK
Represented By: Alyson J. Kirleis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR BUNDICK
Represented By: Alyson J. Kirleis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?