DRUMMOND et al v. ROBINSON TOWNSHIP et al

Plaintiff: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., GPGC LLC and WILLIAM DRUMMOND
Defendant: ROBINSON TOWNSHIP and MARK DORSEY
Case Number: 2:2018cv01127
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Referring Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Record complete for Appeal purposes. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified copy of the docket entries. (ksa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re #38 Notice of Appeal,, by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. indicating that transcript is already on file in the D.C. Clerks office (Gura, Alan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 39 USCA Case Number 19-1394 for #38 Notice of Appeal,, filed by GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., WILLIAM DRUMMOND. USCA Case Manager SLC (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (sc3)
February 15, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #36 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0315-5032255. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. Court Reporter(s): Deborah Rowe. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Gura, Alan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re MOTIONS HEARING held on December 11, 2018 before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Court Reporter Deborah Rowe, Telephone number 412-471-2510. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 2/11/2019. Redaction Request due 2/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019. (dsr)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION and ORDER, #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED; Complaint is hereby DISMISSED. Furthermore, #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/22/19. (jms) Modified text on 1/24/2019. (ksa)
December 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Motion Hearing and oral argument held on 12/11/2018 regarding ECF No #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and ECF No. #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Debbie Rowe) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jms)
November 12, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF re #31 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Gill, Trisha)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file a reply to Plaintiff's Response #31 to Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall file a reply on or before 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/7/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
November 6, 2018 Filing 33 Consented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gill, Trisha) Modified on 11/7/2018 to add additional docket text. (ksa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY BRIEF re #30 Errata, #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #28 Response in Opposition filed by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. (Gura, Alan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 31 BRIEF in Opposition re #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gura, Alan)
October 24, 2018 TEXT NOTICE RESCHEDULING ORAL ARGUMENT: Oral Argument previously set for 12/4/2018 at 09:30 AM is hereby RESCHEDULED for 12/11/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. (jgb)
October 18, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #28 Response in Opposition. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney Gill advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
October 18, 2018 Filing 30 Errata re #28 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. Reason for Correction: Original Document Over Page Limit. (Gill, Trisha)
October 17, 2018 BRIEF in Support of #28 Response in Opposition filed by MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Filed with document #28 ) (ksa)
October 17, 2018 Filing 29 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Gill, Trisha)
October 17, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' to #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Gill, Trisha)
October 17, 2018 Filing 27 BRIEF in Support re #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Gill, Trisha)
October 17, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gill, Trisha)
October 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn J. Horan for all further proceedings. Judge Mark R. Hornak no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:18-mc-1011. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/12/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Riley on behalf of MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Riley, Sean)
September 28, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha A. Gill on behalf of MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Gill, Trisha)
September 25, 2018 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/24/2018. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (jad)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Defendant shall file any motion contemplated by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, as well as any opposition to Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 10/17/18. Plaintiff shall file any response to Defendant's Rule 12 motion and a reply to any opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 10/31/18. Defendant shall be permitted to file a reply to any response to a Rule 12 motion on or before 11/7/18. Oral Argument is hereby SCHEDULED for 12/4/18 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/25/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
September 24, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ERROR: Document should have been filed as three separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney Gura advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. A Telephonic Status Conference is SCHEDULED for TODAY, September 24, 2018, at 4:00 PM before Judge Mark R. Hornak. Please refer to #6 IMPORTANT NOTICE REGARDING TELEPHONE PROCEEDINGS and use Dial-in No. 1 for this conference. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/24/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
September 21, 2018 Filing 20 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. "Document previously filed electronically" (ksa)
September 21, 2018 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support re #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. "Document previously filed electronically" (ksa)
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration of William Drummond, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of William Drummond, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E) (Gura, Alan)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING #15 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Verified Complaint is hereby EXTENDED to 10/10/18. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/12/18. (bdb)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP Answer due from MARK DORSEY on 10/10/2018; ROBINSON TOWNSHIP on 10/10/2018. (Gaetani, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan T. Shuckrow on behalf of ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Shuckrow, Alan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen E. Moore on behalf of ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Moore, Gretchen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Gaetani on behalf of ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (Gaetani, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. re #4 Notice of ADR Designation, (McCune, James)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.. ROBINSON TOWNSHIP served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (McCune, James)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.. MARK DORSEY served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (McCune, James)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by K. Bradley Mellor on behalf of WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Mellor, K.)
August 29, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney Gura is advised for future reference to file a proposed order as a separate PDF document and filed as an attachment to any motion filed in a civil case. No further action is required as this motion has been ruled on by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Alan Gura to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/29/18. (jad)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/29/18. (jad)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Alan Gura to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4843727) by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (McCune, James)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (McCune, James)
August 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP. (ksa)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against MARK DORSEY, ROBINSON TOWNSHIP (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4839846), filed by WILLIAM DRUMMOND, GPGC LLC, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Summons for Robinson Township, #6 Summons for Mark Dorsey) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRUMMOND et al v. ROBINSON TOWNSHIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: James H. McCune
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: K. Bradley Mellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GPGC LLC
Represented By: James H. McCune
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: K. Bradley Mellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM DRUMMOND
Represented By: James H. McCune
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: K. Bradley Mellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINSON TOWNSHIP
Represented By: Alan T. Shuckrow
Represented By: Michael P. Gaetani
Represented By: Gretchen E. Moore
Represented By: Trisha A. Gill
Represented By: Sean R. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK DORSEY
Represented By: Trisha A. Gill
Represented By: Sean R. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?