BRAND v KNORR-BREMSE AG et al
Plaintiff: JOHN BRAND
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC., NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC, KNORR-BREMSE AG, Xorail, Inc., BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC, KNORR BRAKE COMPANY LLC, WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, FAIVELEY TRANSPORT S.A., RAILROAD CONTROLS L.P. and WABTEC RAILWAY ELECTRONICS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01193
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:18-cv-02240. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 5, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER to the Western District of Pennsylvania Associated Case: 1:18-cv-02256. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2018 Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Approving #3 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Response Deadlines. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/27/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Response Deadlines and Proposed Order by Faiveley Transport North America, Inc., Faiveley Transport, S.A., Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Railroad Controls, L.P., Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc., Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation, Xorail, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Andrew)
July 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC, Faiveley Transport North America, Inc., Faiveley Transport, S.A., Knorr Brake Company LLC, Knorr-Bremse AG, New York Air Brake LLC, Railroad Controls, L.P., Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc., Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation, Xorail, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2018 Jury Trial Demand by John Brand(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7460341.), filed by John Brand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC, #3 Summons - Faiveley Transport North America, Inc., #4 Summons - Faiveley Transport S.A., #5 Summons - Knorr Brake Company LLC, #6 Summons - Knorr-Bremse AG, #7 Summons - New York Air Brake LLC, #8 Summons - Railroad Controls, L.P., #9 Summons - Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc., #10 Summons - Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation, #11 Summons - Xorail, Inc.)(Hackett, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRAND v KNORR-BREMSE AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT NORTH AMERICA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK AIR BRAKE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR-BREMSE AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xorail, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNORR BRAKE COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAILROAD CONTROLS L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABTEC RAILWAY ELECTRONICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BRAND
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?