SCHWAB et al v. JO-ANN STORES, INC. et al

Plaintiff: DALE SCHWAB and JANET SCHWAB
Defendant: JO-ANN STORES, LLC and JO-ANN STORES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01215
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. This case is referred to Mediation. Gary P. Caruso is appointed to serve as Mediator. The ADR Conference shall be conducted on or before 1/31/19, unless extended by Order of Court. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/1/18. (jad)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER IMPLEMENTING FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(D). Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/1/18. (jad)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 26(a) shall be made on or before 10/16/18; Joinder of Parties due by 11/12/18; Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/18; Discovery due by 3/29/19; Telephonic Status Conference is SCHEDULED for 3/6/19 at 9:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Hornak. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/1/18. (jad)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/31/18. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (jad)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by JO-ANN STORES, INC., JO-ANN STORES, LLC. (McKeon, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McKeon, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. McKeon on behalf of JO-ANN STORES, INC., JO-ANN STORES, LLC. (McKeon, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference will be held on 10/31/18 at 4:45 PM. The Conference will be conducted via an AT&T dial-in number, which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. To obtain the information required to participate in the conference, please log-in to ECF No. #5 and use Dial-In No. 1. Rule 26(f) Report and stipulation selecting ADR process due on or before 10/24/18. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/19/18. (jad)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by JO-ANN STORES, LLC. (Graver, Wayne)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/13/18. (jad)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by JO-ANN STORES, LLC. (Graver, Wayne) Text modified on 9/13/2018. (ept)
September 12, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 9/19/2018. (ept)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD 18-10606 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4859368), filed by JO-ANN STORES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHWAB et al v. JO-ANN STORES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JO-ANN STORES, LLC
Represented By: Wayne A. Graver
Represented By: Michael F. McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JO-ANN STORES, INC.
Represented By: Michael F. McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE SCHWAB
Represented By: Gerald J. Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET SCHWAB
Represented By: Gerald J. Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?