UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $33,741.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $5,552.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, $14,000.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY and $33,741.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 2:2018cv01274
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: Marilyn J Horan
1 Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF of Publication filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Name of publication: www.forfeiture.gov. Last publication date November 1, 2018. (Lew, David)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn J. Horan for all further proceedings. Judge Arthur J. Schwab no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:18-mc-1011. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/12/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 US Marshal's Return as to U.S. Currency seizing administratively on 5/10/18 and executed on 10/2/18. (sdp)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 US Marshal's Return as to arreat of $5,552.00 in United States Currency executed on 10/2/2018. (ept)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 US Marshal's Return as to Complaint/Warrant executed on 10/02/18. (jjg)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued (jv)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lew, David)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $14,000.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, $33,741.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, $5,552.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $33,741.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,552.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,000.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,741.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: David Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?