WESTOVER v. SAAVEDRA et al
Plaintiff: JOSHUA H. WESTOVER
Defendant: DR. PETER SAAVEDRA, Superintendent TREVOR WINGARD, JOSEPH SILVA, MARK CAPOZZA, NEDRA RICE and MS. SCHWARTZ
Case Number: 2:2018cv01321
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion Decreeing Merit and Certification Thereof as premature and without merit. As of this date, Defendants have not been served nor have they filed their answers to the Complaint. A copy of this order will be mailed to Plaintiff at address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/8/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Plaintiff's Motion Decrying No Merit to Defendants' Defenses as premature and without merit. As of this date, Defendants have not been served nor have they filed their answers to the Complaint. A copy of this order will be mailed to Plaintiff at address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/8/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen) Modified on 11/8/2018. (Kelly, Maureen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION Decreeing Merit and Certification Thereof by JOSHUA H. WESTOVER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION Decrying No Merit to Defendant's Defenses by JOSHUA H. WESTOVER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Submission of service copies due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/15/18. A copy of this Order will be mailed to Plaintiff this day, 10/15/18. (eca)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOSHUA H. WESTOVER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (jjg)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/10/18. A copy of this Order will be mailed to Plaintiff and Inmate Accounting this day, 10/10/18. (eca)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOSHUA H. WESTOVER. (plp)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSHUA H. WESTOVER. (Attachments: #1 Authorization, #2 proposed complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP motion, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Envelope) (plp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTOVER v. SAAVEDRA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. PETER SAAVEDRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent TREVOR WINGARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH SILVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK CAPOZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEDRA RICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA H. WESTOVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?