MCBRIDE et al v. PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: RACHEL L. MCBRIDE and AARON STRADER
Defendant: PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND & JONES, LLP, BARBRA HALIN, MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC., COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, KEITHEA DENNIS, JOHN T. MCVAY, JR., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, ELIZABETH M. BENNETT, SALISSA SMITH, ROBERT P. WENDT, JEREMY J. KOBESKI, ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE and JOSEPH M. JAMES
Case Number: 2:2018cv01401
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Robert C Mitchell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE, ELIZABETH M. BENNETT, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, KEITHEA DENNIS, BARBRA HALIN, JOSEPH M. JAMES, JEREMY J. KOBESKI, JOHN T. MCVAY, JR, MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND & JONES, LLP, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, SALISSA SMITH, ROBERT P. WENDT (mao)
December 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell presiding. (nll)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 12/19/18. (lck)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE, ELIZABETH M. BENNETT, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, KEITHEA DENNIS, BARBRA HALIN, JOSEPH M. JAMES, JEREMY J. KOBESKI, JOHN T. MCVAY, JR, MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND & JONES, LLP, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, SALISSA SMITH, ROBERT P. WENDT, filed by AARON STRADER, RACHEL L. MCBRIDE. (jjg)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/2/18. (ms)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
October 31, 2018 Judge Arthur J. Schwab now presiding. (av)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/30/18. (njt)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668052647), filed by AARON STRADER, RACHEL L. MCBRIDE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCBRIDE et al v. PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND & JONES, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBRA HALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITHEA DENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN T. MCVAY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH M. BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALISSA SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT P. WENDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY J. KOBESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH M. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL L. MCBRIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?