THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO v. PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY

Plaintiff: THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv01439
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Kathy Hofacre, Paralegal on 11/9/2018, filed by THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO. (Walker, Lawrence)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin N. Leonelli on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY. (Leonelli, Justin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY. PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY waiver sent on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Oliver, Antoinette)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Antoinette C. Oliver on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY. (Oliver, Antoinette)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Group, Inc., Munich-American Holding Corporation, Muencher Rueckversicherungs ("Munich Re") as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO. (Klaber, R.)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, filed by THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO. (Klaber, R.)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 10/30/18. (jhi)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4911072), filed by THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO v. PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO
Represented By: R. Douglass Klaber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY
Represented By: Antoinette C. Oliver
Represented By: Justin N. Leonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?