HUDAK v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Plaintiff: PAUL J. HUDAK
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv01508
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Referring Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 49:11503
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. Consistent with Plaintiff's Response (Doc. #14 ), Defendant's Motion (Doc. #5 ) to Dismiss Count II of the Complaint is GRANTED. The dismissal is without prejudice to Plaintiff's pursuing the claim in the existing state-court action. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/4/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
January 3, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #14 Response to Motion. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the initial scheduling conference will be held on February 11, 2019, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 7B, U.S. Post Office and Courthouse Building, 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. Trial counsel shall attend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a Rule 26(f) Report no later than two days before the scheduled conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process no later than two days before the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 01/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ADR Form) (jmb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PAUL J. HUDAK. (Levin, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Judge Cathy Bissoon presiding and Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan referred. (nll)
December 21, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer presiding in case. (nll)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Zidian, Chloe)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by PAUL J. HUDAK. (Levin, Daniel) Modified text on 12/18/2018. (ksa)
December 17, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney Sirbak is advised for future reference to file a proposed order as a separate PDF document and filed as an attachment to any motion filed in a civil case. No further action is required as this motion has been ruled on by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING the #10 Motion for Joseph P. Sirbak, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/17/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Joseph P. Sirbak II to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4966685) by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit 1 - Cert of Good Standing) (Sirbak, Joseph)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than January 2, 2019. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying Norfolk Southern Corporation, Pocahontas Land Corp., Thoroughbred Technology & Telecommunications, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Zidian, Chloe)
December 11, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 12/18/2018. (ksa)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Johnston, J.)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service) (Johnston, J.)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per Rule 12(b)(1) re #1 Complaint by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Johnston, J.) Modified text on 12/11/2018. (ksa)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chloe C. Zidian on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Zidian, Chloe)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Aaron Rihn on behalf of PAUL J. HUDAK. (Rihn, D.)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/14/2018. (jmb)
November 9, 2018 Summons Issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (jjg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4929075), filed by PAUL J. HUDAK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUDAK v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Chloe C. Zidian
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Represented By: Joseph P. Sirbak, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL J. HUDAK
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: D. Aaron Rihn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?