HOUZE v. DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC. et al

Plaintiff: JUSTIN A. HOUZE
Defendant: DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC. and MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01555
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 15 BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by JUSTIN A. HOUZE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service) (Chiurazzi, Wayne)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to File Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Brief in Opposition due by 1/7/2019; Reply due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 1/3/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmc)
January 2, 2019 13 BRIEF in Opposition re #11 Motion to Extend Time filed by DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC., MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Wescoe, James)
January 2, 2019 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #11 Motion to Extend Time to File Brief filed by DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC., MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Wescoe, James) Modified text on 1/3/2019 to add document linkage. (ept)
December 31, 2018 11 MOTION to Extend Time to File Brief by JUSTIN A. HOUZE. (Attachments: #1 Order of Court) (Chiurazzi, Wayne)
December 31, 2018 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JUSTIN A. HOUZE. (Attachments: #1 Order of Court) (Chiurazzi, Wayne)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 2/19/19 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 2/4/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/11/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 12/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process; and #2 Exhibit B - Rule 26 Report Form) (njt)
December 10, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd R. Brown on behalf of DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC., MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC. (Brown, Todd)
December 10, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Pion on behalf of DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC., MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC. (Pion, John)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re defendants' #4 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response and Brief in Opposition due by 12/31/2018. Defendants' Reply Brief due by 1/14/2019. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/30/18. (njt)
November 30, 2018 5 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (njt)
November 21, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Motion to Dismiss. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed w/ #4 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss which was dated 11/21/2018. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept) Modified text on 11/23/2018. (jv)
November 21, 2018 w/ #4 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC., MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC. (ept)
November 21, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss by DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC., MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit) (Wescoe, James)
November 19, 2018 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC.. (Wescoe, James)
November 19, 2018 2 Disclosure Statement identifying UniGroup, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC. (Wescoe, James)
November 19, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/26/2018. (ept)
November 16, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Beaver County, case number GD 11359-2018 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4936604), filed by DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC., MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOUZE v. DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBO MOVING AND STORAGE, INC.
Represented By: James A. Wescoe
Represented By: Todd R. Brown
Represented By: John T. Pion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYFLOWER TRANSIT, LLC
Represented By: James A. Wescoe
Represented By: Todd R. Brown
Represented By: John T. Pion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN A. HOUZE
Represented By: Wayne M. Chiurazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?