CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
Plaintiff: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC
Counter Claimant: ANTHONY MARTIN
Case Number: 2:2018cv01609
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Schletker on behalf of ANTHONY MARTIN. (Schletker, Steven)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Steven Schletker, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Anthony Martin. The Court no longer utilizes a "sponsorship" model for pro hac vice admission. In the future, counsel must comply with the provision in Local Rule 83.2.B stating, "[a] motion for admission pro hac vice must be made[, i.e., filed,] by the attorney seeking to be admitted" (in this case, Steven Schletker). Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/23/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Steven C. Schletker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5002609) by Anthony Martin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Moschetta, Stephen)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC by Anthony Martin. (Moschetta, Stephen)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Moschetta on behalf of Anthony Martin. (Moschetta, Stephen)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 REISSUE OF NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY PER 8 ORDER ON MOTION (jd)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #7 ) to Extend Time to Publish Notice of Filing Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability and Reissuance of Notice is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall, forthwith, reissue the Notice out of and under seal of this Court reflecting the date of February 15, 2019 as the date fixed for filing of claims. Counsel for Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. shall cause the Notice to be published in the Pittsburgh Post-Gazette once each week for four (4) consecutive weeks prior to February 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/8/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to February 15, 2019 by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY re #5 Order on Motion (jd)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #4 ) for Approval of the Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking, for an Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice, and for Issuance of an Injunction is GRANTED. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/14/18. (rdl)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for (1) Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking; (2) an Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice; and (3) Issuance of an Injunction by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Bagnato, Marjorie)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Watson on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Watson, Dennis)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4951807), filed by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC
Represented By: Marjorie Bagnato
Represented By: Dennis A Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ANTHONY MARTIN
Represented By: Steven C. Schletker
Represented By: Stephen P. Moschetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?