WILSON v. TWITTER

Plaintiff: ROGER WILSON
Defendant: TWITTER
Case Number: 2:2018cv01610
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
1 Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint filed by ROGER WILSON. It is respectfully recommended that the Complaint be dismissed with prejudice, as frivolous pursuant to the screening provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF User Roger Wilson due by 2/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/16/19. (kld)
January 16, 2019 Judge Nora Barry Fischer now presiding and Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy referred. Motions referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (av)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to TWITTER (cel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal re #3 Complaint by ROGER WILSON. (Attachments: #1 USM Form) (cel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against TWITTER (IFP Granted) filed by ROGER WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/9/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kld)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROGER WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for Twitter, #4 USM 285 Form, #5 Motion to have Marshall Make Service) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. TWITTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWITTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?