SCHALLER v. U.S. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION et al

Plaintiff: LESLIE SCHALLER
Defendant: U.S. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Case Number: 2:2018cv01625
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LESLIE SCHALLER. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mailing Receipt) (Goddard, Matthew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LESLIE SCHALLER. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mailing Receipt) (Goddard, Matthew) Modified text on 1/3/2019. (ept)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LESLIE SCHALLER. U.S. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mailing Receipt) (Goddard, Matthew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LESLIE SCHALLER. NANCY A. BERRYHILL served on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mailing Receipt) (Goddard, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Goddard on behalf of LESLIE SCHALLER. (Goddard, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Michael F. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/17/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Paul Suitter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/17/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Susan Davies to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/17/18. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's only notice on the matter. (eca)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Thomas Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/17/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
December 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly presiding. Judge Donetta W. Ambrose no longer assigned to case. (nll)
December 13, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Orders were made part of main documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Michael F. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4963613) by LESLIE SCHALLER. (Tobin, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Paul Suitter to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4963608) by LESLIE SCHALLER. (Tobin, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Susan Davies to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4963605) by LESLIE SCHALLER. (Tobin, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Thomas Tobin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4963599) by LESLIE SCHALLER. (Tobin, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Donetta W. Ambrose for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/07/18. (eca)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (ept)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4955255), filed by LESLIE SCHALLER. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Constitutional Challenge to Statute, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney, #5 Summons Commissioner, #6 Summons Social Security Administration) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHALLER v. U.S. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE SCHALLER
Represented By: Michael A. Comber
Represented By: Matthew B. Goddard
Represented By: Thomas J Tobin
Represented By: Paul Suitter
Represented By: Michael F. Williams
Represented By: Susan M Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?