JOHNSON v. UPMC MCKEESPORT et al

Plaintiff: LAUREL JOHNSON
Defendant: UPMC MCKEESPORT and UPMC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01675
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney James Patrick Lopez has been terminated, and attorney Kayla Drum continues to represent Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/14/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
February 14, 2019 4 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by LAUREL JOHNSON. (Drum, Kayla)
January 14, 2019 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LAUREL JOHNSON. UPMC MCKEESPORT waiver sent on 1/4/2018, answer due 3/5/2018. (Lopez, James)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/18/18. (jhi)
December 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against UPMC, UPMC MCKEESPORT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4968794), filed by LAUREL JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. UPMC MCKEESPORT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPMC MCKEESPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREL JOHNSON
Represented By: James Patrick Lopez
Represented By: Kayla Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?