LUCIA v. HOLDINGS ACQUISITION CO LP
Plaintiff: ALLEN J. LUCIA
Defendant: HOLDINGS ACQUISITION CO LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv01690
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALLEN J. LUCIA. HOLDINGS ACQUISITION CO LP waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Dion, Samuel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel A. Dion on behalf of ALLEN J. LUCIA. (Dion, Samuel)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany A. Jenca on behalf of HOLDINGS ACQUISITION CO LP. (Jenca, Tiffany)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariah L Passarelli on behalf of HOLDINGS ACQUISITION CO LP. (Passarelli, Mariah)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ALLEN J. LUCIA (cel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOLDINGS ACQUISITION CO LP (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4973154)filed by ALLEN J. LUCIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Designation Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUCIA v. HOLDINGS ACQUISITION CO LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN J. LUCIA
Represented By: Richard B. Bateman, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel A. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLDINGS ACQUISITION CO LP
Represented By: Tiffany A. Jenca
Represented By: Mariah L Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?