HOHMAN et al v. BONEFISH GRILL, LLC
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS HOHMAN and DUANE GULISH
Defendant: BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC. and BONEFISH GRILL, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01700
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert C Mitchell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Errata re #8 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by BONEFISH GRILL, LLC. Reason for Correction: Adding Plaintiff's counsel signature.. (Salvatore, Bethany)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 ERROR: S/ SIGNATURE IS MISSING; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by BONEFISH GRILL, LLC. (Salvatore, Bethany) Modified text on 2/19/2019. (cel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany C. Salvatore on behalf of BONEFISH GRILL, LLC. (Salvatore, Bethany)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management set for 4/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Suite 9240 before Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell. Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 2/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 3/25/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 1/28/2019. (spc)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC. (Smith, Matthew) Modified text on 1/28/2019. (cel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION by BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC.. (Smith, Matthew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC. Answer due from BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC. on 1/25/2019. (Smith, Matthew)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC. as the Corporate Parent of BONEFISH GRILL, LLC (cel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-18-015493 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4978342) filed by BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOHMAN et al v. BONEFISH GRILL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS HOHMAN
Represented By: Finnian M. Carstens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE GULISH
Represented By: Finnian M. Carstens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONEFISH GRILL, LLC
Represented By: Matthew F. Smith
Represented By: Bethany C. Salvatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?