WOODY PARTNERS v. MAGUIRE et al
Plaintiff: WOODY PARTNERS
Defendant: MATTHEW R. MAGUIRE, PATRICK MAGUIRE, ROBERT LEWIS, DAVID MINNOTTE, ROBERT CAMPBELL, BOUSTEAD SECURITIES, LLC and MELVIN PIRCHESKY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00018
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Oral Argument held on 3/7/2019 re Plaintiff's #32 Motion to Remand or for Abstention. James Cooney and Ryan Cooney appearing for Plaintiffs. For Defendants: Keith Whitson for Minotte; William Stickman for Lewis; Brian Bisignani for Maguires; and Christopher Parrington for Boustead Defendants. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Noreen Re) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rtw)
March 4, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #42 Brief in Support of Motion. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate documents. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 42 BRIEF in Support re #32 Motion to Remand to State Court and Motion for Abstention (Brief in Support of Motion for Remand and/or for Abstention) filed by WOODY PARTNERS. (Cooney, James) Modified text on 3/4/2019 to add additional document linkage. (ksa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #32 Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by MATTHEW R. MAGUIRE, PATRICK MAGUIRE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bisignani, Brian)
February 22, 2019 Filing 40 BRIEF in Opposition re #32 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by BOUSTEAD SECURITIES, LLC, ROBERT CAMPBELL, MELVIN PIRCHESKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Parrington, Christopher)
February 22, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #32 Motion to Remand to State Court, Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by DAVID MINNOTTE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Short, Stephanie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 38 BRIEF in Opposition re #32 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by ROBERT LEWIS. (Cavanaugh, Patrick)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to admit Christopher P. Parrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/22/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 36 Errata re #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, of Christopher P. Parrington by BOUSTEAD SECURITIES, LLC, ROBERT CAMPBELL, MELVIN PIRCHESKY. Reason for Correction: Attorney Parrington's signature requirement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit A, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service) (Parrington, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney Parrington advised of signature requirements. Attorney Parrington to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for attorney Christopher P. Parrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5029248) by BOUSTEAD SECURITIES, LLC, ROBERT CAMPBELL, MELVIN PIRCHESKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service) (Parrington, Christopher)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Stephanie A. Short for DAVID MINNOTTE. Attorney Eric A. Schaffer and Jeffrey G. Wilhelm terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/14/2019. (jgb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by DAVID MINNOTTE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whitson, Keith)
February 7, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #32 Motion to Remand to State Court. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney Cooney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed Motion for Abstention. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
February 6, 2019 MOTION for Abstention by WOODY PARTNERS. (Filed with document #32 ) (ksa)
February 6, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Remand to State Court by WOODY PARTNERS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cooney, James)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, All matters in this case are ordered STAYED until further Order of Court. Plaintiff to file Motion to Remand and/or Abstain by 2/8/19; Defendants to respond to said Motion by 2/22/19; Plaintiff may reply by 3/1/19. Oral Argument set for 3/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/1/19. (jms)
February 1, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Telephonic status conference held on 2/1/19. All matters in this case are ordered stayed until further Order of Court, Plaintiff to file Motion to Remand and/or Abstain by 2/8/19; Defendants to respond to said Motion by 2/22/19; Plaintiff may reply by 3/1/19. Oral argument to be held shortly thereafter. Court order regarding the above to follow. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (jms)
February 1, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Motion to appear pro hac vice not filed by attorney seeking to be admitted pro hac vice. CORRECTION: Attorney Bisignani advised for future reference that motions to appear pro hac vice are to be filed by the attorney seeking to be admitted pro hac vice. No further action is required as this motion has been ruled on by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion for John N. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is hereby set for 2/1/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Please refer to 22 for call-in procedures. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER CONTINUING the 1/30/2019 Telephonic Status conference pending further Order of Court. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/29/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
January 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for attorney John N. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5009455) by MATTHEW R. MAGUIRE, PATRICK MAGUIRE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John N. Joseph in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Admitting John N Joseph Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Service) (Bisignani, Brian)
January 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. ERROR: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by another attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney Andreuzzi advised for future reference that motions to appear pro hac vice are to be filed by the attorney seeking to be admitted pro hac vice. No further action is required as this motion has been ruled on by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion for Andrew R. Shedlock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/29/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Andrew R. Shedlock to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5008467) by BOUSTEAD SECURITIES, LLC, ROBERT CAMPBELL, MELVIN PIRCHESKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Andrew Shedlock) (Andreuzzi, Lindsay)
January 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W. Bisignani on behalf of MATTHEW R. MAGUIRE, PATRICK MAGUIRE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bisignani, Brian)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/30/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn Horan. Call-in procedures will be provided in a separate entry. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/28/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 JOINDER of MATTHEW R. MAGUIRE, PATRICK MAGUIRE to #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Joinder Removal, #2 Certificate of Service) (Bisignani, Brian)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE (Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027(e)(3)) by WOODY PARTNERS (Cooney, James)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response for Defendants Boustead Securities, LLC, Melvin Pirchesky and Robert Campbell to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is further ORDERED that Defendants Bousted Securities, LLC, Melvin Pirschesky and Robert Campbell's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint is and includes 2/4/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/18/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Complaint by BOUSTEAD SECURITIES, LLC, ROBERT CAMPBELL, MELVIN PIRCHESKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Andreuzzi, Lindsay)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant ROBERT LEWIS to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Defendant Robert Lewis' deadline to file a response is 2/4/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/17/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 JOINDER of BOUSTEAD SECURITIES, LLC, ROBERT CAMPBELL, MELVIN PIRCHESKY to #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Andreuzzi, Lindsay)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay B. Andreuzzi on behalf of BOUSTEAD SECURITIES, LLC, ROBERT CAMPBELL, MELVIN PIRCHESKY. (Andreuzzi, Lindsay)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by ROBERT LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gordon, Zachary)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary N. Gordon on behalf of ROBERT LEWIS. (Gordon, Zachary)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Stickman, IV on behalf of ROBERT LEWIS. (Stickman, William)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendant David Minnotte to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Response due on or before 2/4/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/14/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Defendant David Minnotte to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DAVID MINNOTTE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wilhelm, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Cooney on behalf of WOODY PARTNERS. (Cooney, Ryan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Cooney on behalf of WOODY PARTNERS. (Cooney, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O. Lampl on behalf of WOODY PARTNERS. (Lampl, Robert)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick K. Cavanaugh on behalf of ROBERT LEWIS. (Cavanaugh, Patrick)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: LIST OF ALL PLAINTIFF'S ASSOCIATED WITH THIS CASE. (jgb) Modified text on 1/10/2019. (jgb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 JOINDER of ROBERT LEWIS to #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cavanaugh, Patrick)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DAVID MINNOTTE re #1 Notice of Removal, (Schaffer, Eric)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 18-015969 Copies attached: State Court Docket Sheet and Complaint, Acceptance of Service and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4986177), filed by DAVID MINNOTTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Docket and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODY PARTNERS v. MAGUIRE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW R. MAGUIRE
Represented By: John N Joseph
Represented By: Christopher P. Parrington
Represented By: Brian W. Bisignani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK MAGUIRE
Represented By: John N Joseph
Represented By: Christopher P. Parrington
Represented By: Brian W. Bisignani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT LEWIS
Represented By: Patrick K. Cavanaugh
Represented By: Christopher P. Parrington
Represented By: William S. Stickman, IV
Represented By: Zachary N. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID MINNOTTE
Represented By: Eric A. Schaffer
Represented By: Keith E. Whitson
Represented By: Stephanie A. Short
Represented By: Christopher P. Parrington
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CAMPBELL
Represented By: Lindsay B. Andreuzzi
Represented By: Christopher P. Parrington
Represented By: Andrew R. Shedlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOUSTEAD SECURITIES, LLC
Represented By: Lindsay B. Andreuzzi
Represented By: Christopher P. Parrington
Represented By: Andrew R. Shedlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELVIN PIRCHESKY
Represented By: Lindsay B. Andreuzzi
Represented By: Christopher P. Parrington
Represented By: Andrew R. Shedlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WOODY PARTNERS
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Represented By: Robert O. Lampl
Represented By: Ryan J. Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?