ETLING v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Plaintiff: EDITH ETLING
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00035
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Errata re #8 Notice of Appearance of Ryan Flaherty, Esq by EDITH ETLING. Reason for Correction: Revised entry of appearance of Ryan Flaherty on behalf of Edith Etling. (Flaherty, Ryan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Flaherty on behalf of EDITH ETLING. (Flaherty, Ryan) Document removed from public view and redocketed at #9 . Modified text on 3/1/2019. (ept)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chloe C. Zidian on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Zidian, Chloe)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Suite 10160 before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 2/27/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report, Proposed Case Management Order, ADR Stipulation, Confidential Position Letters, and Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 3/15/2019 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/18/2019. (sms)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Johnston, J.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited, Washington Terminal Company, United States, American Premier Underwriters, Inc., American Finanancial Goup, Inc., Burlington Northern and Sante Fe, LLC, Berkshire Hathaway, Canadian Pacific Railway, and Canadian National Railway as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Johnston, J.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Johnston, J.)
January 15, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 1/22/2019. (ept)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/15/2019. (sms)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common PLeas of Allegheny County, case number GD 18-17107 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4992795), filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ETLING v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDITH ETLING
Represented By: Marc I. Simon
Represented By: Ryan M. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Represented By: Chloe C. Zidian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?