MOBERG v. BROURMAN et al

Plaintiff: SHAUN W. MOBERG
Defendant: ANTHONY VISCON, MITCH BROURMAN and TH3 PROPERTIES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00075
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHAUN W. MOBERG. MITCH BROURMAN waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Price, Jennifer)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHAUN W. MOBERG. TH3 PROPERTIES waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; ANTHONY VISCON waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Price, Jennifer)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MITCH BROURMAN, TH3 PROPERTIES, ANTHONY VISCON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5003421), filed by SHAUN W. MOBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOBERG v. BROURMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY VISCON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCH BROURMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TH3 PROPERTIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAUN W. MOBERG
Represented By: Jennifer O. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?