MOTORIST MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. GMR RESTAURANTS

Petitioner: MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Respondent: GMR RESTAURANTS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00112
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by GMR RESTAURANTS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (Kinsman, Malena)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. John M. Noble is appointed as mediator. Party JOHN M. NOBLE added. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/18/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See contents of this filing for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/18/19. (rdl)
March 18, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Bissoon: Case Management Conference held on 3/18/2019. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: none) (rdl)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion of Parties to Appear by Telephone. The parties may participate in the Initial Conference scheduled for 3/18/19 at 10:30 AM by telephone. Counsel shall call Chambers on a single telephone line, and counsel for Plaintiff, Mr. Walker, shall coordinate the call. Moving forward, counsel and the parties must be prepared to observe the in-person attendance requirements in the undersigned's orders and Practices & Procedures. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/13/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
March 13, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Walker, Lawrence)
March 13, 2019 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Walker, Lawrence)
March 13, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Initial Conference on March 18, 2019 by MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Walker, Lawrence)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Lawrence F. Walker, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. The Court no longer utilizes a "sponsorship" model for pro hac vice admission. In the future, counsel must comply with the provision in Local Rule 83.2.B stating, "[a] motion for admission pro hac vice must be made[, i.e., filed,] by the attorney seeking to be admitted" (in this case, Lawrence F. Walker). Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/13/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
February 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Lawrence F. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5027201) by MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service) (Klaber, R.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Malena S. Kinsman on behalf of GMR RESTAURANTS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (Kinsman, Malena)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Douglass Klaber, Jr on behalf of MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Klaber, R.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Lock on behalf of GMR RESTAURANTS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (Lock, John)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/6/19. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, setting Case Management in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/6/19. (jhi)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/5/19. (jhi)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:18-cv-02072. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of PA and CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/4/2019. (sc)
February 4, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a proposed order for Doc. 10. (pjr)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #9 Order to Show Cause, Agreed Stipulation to Transfer Matter to the Western District of Pennsylvania by Motorists Mutual Insurance Company. (Walker, Lawrence)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiff is directed to show cause, within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, why the above-captioned action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406. Show Cause Response due by 2/6/2019. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/30/2019. (ve)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/29/2019. (ve)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GMR Restaurants of Pennsylvania, Inc..(Kinsman, Malena)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorists Mutual Insurance Company. (Walker, Lawrence)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by GMR Restaurants of Pennsylvania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kinsman, Malena)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GMR Restaurants of Pennsylvania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kinsman, Malena)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Christina Battiston, Authorized Agent on 10/26/2018, filed by Motorists Mutual Insurance Company. (Walker, Lawrence)
October 25, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Judge Kane. (ao)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GMR Restaurants of Pennsylvania, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GMR Restaurants of Pennsylvania, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4581454), filed by Motorists Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOTORIST MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. GMR RESTAURANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GMR RESTAURANTS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.
Represented By: Malena S. Kinsman
Represented By: John P. Lock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Lawrence F. Walker
Represented By: R. Douglass Klaber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?