MILLER v. PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: KATHY L. MILLER
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA and BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00150
Filed: February 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/2/19. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/2/19. (jhi)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Loomis-Gustafson, Carly) Modified text on 4/2/2019. (cel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Loomis-Gustafson, Carly)
March 12, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from all Defendants by 4/2/19. See Stip. (Doc. #7 ). (dcd)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA Answer due from All Defendants. (Loomis-Gustafson, Carly)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carly Loomis-Gustafson on behalf of BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Loomis-Gustafson, Carly)
March 1, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA on 3/12/2019 (cel)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATHY L. MILLER. PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Stember, John) Modified text on 3/1/2019. (cel)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/25/19. (jhi)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATHY L. MILLER. BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Stember, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (cel)
February 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5023864)filed by KATHY L. MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Carly Loomis-Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Represented By: Carly Loomis-Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY L. MILLER
Represented By: John Stember
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?