ITASCA IMAGES, LLC v. HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY

Plaintiff: ITASCA IMAGES, LLC
Defendant: HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00155
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #41 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. ERROR: Counsel is advised the Stipulation Selecting ADR form has been updated. Dispose of all previous versions of the Stipulation and begin using the amended form, with the revision date 4/2017. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
March 26, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph)
March 26, 2019 Filing 40 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Butcher, Joseph)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Consent Motion to Continue Case Management Conference; that the Case Management Conference set for 4/2/19 at 2:30 PM is re-set to be held telephonically on 4/22/19 at 12:30 PM before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. The Court shall initiate said call. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
March 12, 2019 Filing 38 Consent MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by ITASCA IMAGES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Flaherty, Scott)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 3/26/19; A Case Management Conference is set for 4/2/19 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 5B before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (jg)
February 28, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; that Defendant Horizon Supply Company shall file its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 2/28/19. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/20/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by ITASCA IMAGES, LLC by HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Butcher, Joseph)
February 19, 2019 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Defendant Horizon Supply Company's Motion for Substitution/Termination of Counsel and that the Clerk of Courts is directed to mark the docket to reflect that Attorneys Eric J. Steinhoff and Michael Thomas Burke of Lind, Jensen, Sullivan & Peterson, P.A. are no longer counsel of record for Defendant Horizon Supply Company. Attorney Joseph F. Butcher ofZimmer Kunz PLLC will remain as counsel of record for Defendant Horizon Supply Company. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/19/19. (jg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Butcher, Joseph)
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Butcher on behalf of HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph)
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Emailed copy of Transmittal Letter, AO 121 Form, Complaint, Exhibits and Docket Sheet to the Register of Copyrights. (ept)
February 15, 2019 Filing 28 AO 121 NOTICE by ITASCA IMAGES, LLC (Flaherty, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Scott M. Flaherty, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/15/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 26 Proposed Order re #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Flaherty by ITASCA IMAGES, LLC. (Flaherty, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Scott M. Flaherty to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5030956) by ITASCA IMAGES, LLC. (Flaherty, Scott)
February 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Finkel on behalf of ITASCA IMAGES, LLC. (Finkel, Robert)
February 13, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. Attorney to submit AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. Attorney advised to file the Notice within 7 days. The link to the report can be found under Other Forms at: http://www.uscourts.gov/FormsAndFees/Forms/CourtFormsByCategory.aspx (ept)
February 13, 2019 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:18-cv-03387. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TRANFERRING CASE based on #20 the Stipulation filed by the parties. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 2/7/2019. (KMW)
February 7, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Stipulation,. (Flaherty, Scott)
February 7, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to Western District of Pennsylvania by Itasca Images, LLC. Jointly Signed by Horizon Supply Company. (Flaherty, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #14 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Horizon Supply Company.(Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue: Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Burke, Michael) Modified text/location on 1/17/2019 (lmb).
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Horizon Supply Company.(Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Jim Roe in SUPPORT OF #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Horizon Supply Company.(Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Burke on behalf of Horizon Supply Company. (Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Itasca Images, LLC re #1 Complaint,, Summons and Civil Cover Sheet (Flaherty, Scott)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Horizon Supply Company answer due 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 1/4/2019. (MME)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Horizon Supply Company.(Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Eric J. Steinhoff in Support of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed : Date and time to be determined. (Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Steinhoff, Eric)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Horizon Supply Company. (lmb)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-3387 (NEB/SER). (lmb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Itasca Images, LLC. (Flaherty, Scott)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Horizon Supply Company (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6547738) filed by Itasca Images, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Exhibit(s) Q, #18 Exhibit(s) R, #19 Exhibit(s) S, #20 Exhibit(s) T, #21 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Scott) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ITASCA IMAGES, LLC v. HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORIZON SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Represented By: Eric J Steinhoff
Represented By: Joseph F. Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ITASCA IMAGES, LLC
Represented By: O. Joseph Balthazor, Jr
Represented By: Scott M Flaherty
Represented By: Scott M. Flaherty
Represented By: Robert D. Finkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?