WALLING v. KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: STEVE WALLING and TIMBER HILL LLC
Defendant: DAVID KNOPF, 3G CAPITAL INC., CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, BERNARDO HEES, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI, PAULO BASILIO and VINCE GARLATI
Petitioner: KRAFT HEINZ INVESTOR GROUP, EARL G. CHESSON REVOCABLE TRYST, THE CHESSON LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, EARL CHESSON, ARCA INVESTMENTS, A.S., THE NEW YORK CITY FUNDS, UNION ASSET MANAGEMENT HOLDING AG, SJUNDE AP-FONDEN and KRUPA GLOBAL INVESTMENTS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00214
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by STEVE WALLING (Rudman, Samuel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 50 BRIEF in Support re #47 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Timber Hill LLC. (Entwistle, Andrew)
April 25, 2019 Filing 49 DECLARATION re #47 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel by Timber Hill LLC Affiant: Andrew J. Entwistle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Entwistle, Andrew)
April 25, 2019 Filing 48 DECLARATION re #45 MOTION For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sjunde AP-Fonden, Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Kobrin, Joshua)
April 25, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel by Timber Hill LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Entwistle, Andrew)
April 25, 2019 Filing 46 BRIEF in Support re #45 Motion for appointment as lead plaintiff, Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Sjunde AP-Fonden, Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Kobrin, Joshua) Modified text on 4/26/2019. (jv)
April 25, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sjunde AP-Fonden, Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kobrin, Joshua)
April 25, 2019 Filing 44 DECLARATION re #42 MOTION APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL by ARCA INVESTMENTS, A.S., KRUPA GLOBAL INVESTMENTS Affiant: Robert C. Finkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Fox, Bruce)
April 25, 2019 Filing 43 BRIEF in Support re #42 Motion for APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL filed by ARCA INVESTMENTS, A.S., KRUPA GLOBAL INVESTMENTS. (Fox, Bruce)
April 25, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL by ARCA INVESTMENTS, A.S., KRUPA GLOBAL INVESTMENTS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fox, Bruce)
April 25, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. Entwistle to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5114709) by Timber Hill LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation of Andrew J. Entwistle with Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Entwistle, Andrew)
April 25, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION re #39 Brief in Support - Other, #38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Earl Chesson, Earl G. Chesson Revocable Tryst, The Chesson Limited Partnership Affiant: David Dean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Dean, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 39 BRIEF in Support of #38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Earl Chesson, Earl G. Chesson Revocable Tryst, The Chesson Limited Partnership. (Dean, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Earl Chesson, The Chesson Limited Partnership, Earl G. Chesson Revocable Tryst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dean, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION re #35 MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by The New York City Funds Affiant: Robert L. Saldutti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Saldutti, Robert)
April 25, 2019 Filing 36 BRIEF in Support re #35 Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by The New York City Funds. (Saldutti, Robert)
April 25, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by The New York City Funds. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Saldutti, Robert)
April 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Saldutti on behalf of The New York City Funds. (Saldutti, Robert)
April 25, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION re #31 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Counsel by Kraft Heinz Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Certificate of Service) (Coppola, Vincent)
April 25, 2019 Filing 32 BRIEF in Support re #31 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Kraft Heinz Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Coppola, Vincent)
April 25, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Counsel by Kraft Heinz Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Coppola, Vincent)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER. A Telephonic Status Conference is hereby SCHEDULED for 5/13/19 at 1:00 PM before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak. The conference will be held jointly with 2:19-cv-307. Please refer to #5 AT&T Scheduling Notice and use dial-in no. 1 for this conference. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER APPROVING #28 Stipulation. The Court hereby enters the Order as set forth herein. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/22/19. (bdb)
April 18, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Arnold, Roy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Kraft Heinz Canada ULC, Heinz Brasil, S.A., and H.J. Heinz Finance UK Plc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Arnold, Roy)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for William A. Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/10/19. (jad)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/10/19. (jad)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTINGg #21 Motion for Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/10/19. (jad)
April 9, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for attorney William A. Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5094448) by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Clareman, William)
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5094446) by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Ehrlich, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5094445) by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawna J. English on behalf of KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (English, Shawna)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy W. Arnold on behalf of KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Arnold, Roy)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for David A. Rosenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/11/19. (jad)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Samuel H. Rudman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/11/19. (jad)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 Errata re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by STEVE WALLING. Reason for Correction: Incorrect filer login. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of David A. Rosenfeld with attached Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Rosenfeld, David)
March 11, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVE WALLING. GEORGE ZOGHBI waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVE WALLING. CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVE WALLING. KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVE WALLING. DAVID KNOPF waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVE WALLING. BERNARDO HEES waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVE WALLING. VINCE GARLATI waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVE WALLING. PAULO BASILIO waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by STEVE WALLING. 3G CAPITAL INC. served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney David A. Rosenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5057080) by STEVE WALLING. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of David A. Rosenfeld with attached Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Rudman, Samuel)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Samuel H. Rudman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5057067) by STEVE WALLING. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Samuel H. Rudman with attached Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Rudman, Samuel)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/28/19. (bdb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 3G CAPITAL INC., PAULO BASILIO, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, GEORGE ZOGHBI (jv)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3G CAPITAL INC., PAULO BASILIO, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, GEORGE ZOGHBI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5043507), filed by STEVE WALLING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Certification of Plaintiff, #3 Summons as to 3 G Capital, #4 Summons as to Paulo Basilio, #5 Summons as to Bernardo Hees, #6 Summons as to Vince Garlati, #7 Summons as to Kraft Heinz Company, #8 Summons as to David Knopf, #9 Summons as to Christopher R. Skinger, #10 Summons as to George Zoghbi) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALLING v. KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID KNOPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3G CAPITAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARDO HEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Roy W. Arnold
Represented By: Shawna J. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE ZOGHBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULO BASILIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCE GARLATI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE WALLING
Represented By: Alfred G. Yates, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMBER HILL LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KRAFT HEINZ INVESTOR GROUP
Represented By: Vincent A. Coppola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EARL G. CHESSON REVOCABLE TRYST
Represented By: David P. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE CHESSON LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: David P. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EARL CHESSON
Represented By: David P. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ARCA INVESTMENTS, A.S.
Represented By: Bruce C. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE NEW YORK CITY FUNDS
Represented By: Robert L. Saldutti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNION ASSET MANAGEMENT HOLDING AG
Represented By: Joshua Kobrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SJUNDE AP-FONDEN
Represented By: Joshua Kobrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KRUPA GLOBAL INVESTMENTS
Represented By: Bruce C. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?