PATTERSON v. THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, et al

Plaintiff: JASON PATTERSON
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE, THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION and PROGRESSIVE DRIVE INSURANCE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00218
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON MOTIONS PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/11/19. (rtw)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management set for 5/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Rule 26 Meeting Report Stipulation Selecting ADR due by 5/14/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (rtw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by PROGRESSIVE, PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DRIVE INSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION. (Twilla, Daniel)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Ramaley on behalf of PROGRESSIVE, PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DRIVE INSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION. (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying DRIVE INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC, THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, MIDLAND FINANCIAL GOUP, INC. PROGRESSIVE DIRECT HOLDING, INC, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PROGRESSIVE, PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DRIVE INSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION. (ksa)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 19-000097 Copies attached: Praecipe for Writ of Summons, Praecipe for Appearance, Praecipe for Issuance of Rule to File Complaint, Acceptance of Service and Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 03155044651), filed by THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Praecipe for Writ of Summons, #3 Exhibit B Praecipe for Appearance, #4 Exhibit C Praecipe for Issuance of Rule to File Complaint, #5 Exhibit D Acceptance of Service, #6 Exhibit E Complaint, #7 Certificate of Service) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON v. THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE DRIVE INSURANCE
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON PATTERSON
Represented By: Gary J. Ogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?