CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC v. GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC
Defendant: CATHAY RESOURCES INC., CATHAY RESOURCES CORP., VENTURA P. KRUTZ, JR. and CARBIDE CONSULTANTS COMPANY, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION
3Rd Party Defendant: CHRISTOPHER W. KOLB
Case Number: 2:2019cv00235
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CATHAY RESOURCES CORP.. (Lloyd, Bethann)
April 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Kundar on behalf of CATHAY RESOURCES CORP.. (Kundar, Kathleen)
April 30, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethann R. Lloyd on behalf of CATHAY RESOURCES CORP., CATHAY RESOURCES INC.. (Lloyd, Bethann)
April 26, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC. CARBIDE CONSULTANTS COMPANY, LLC served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/15/2019; VENTURA P. KRUTZ, JR served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Belczyk, David)
April 18, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Lacey on behalf of CARBIDE CONSULTANTS COMPANY, LLC, GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION, VENTURA P. KRUTZ, JR. (Lacey, Alex)
April 18, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A Patter on behalf of CARBIDE CONSULTANTS COMPANY, LLC, GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION, VENTURA P. KRUTZ, JR. (Patter, Julie)
April 18, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Manfredi McKinley on behalf of CARBIDE CONSULTANTS COMPANY, LLC, GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION, VENTURA P. KRUTZ, JR. (McKinley, Christina)
April 9, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to CARBIDE CONSULTANTS COMPANY, LLC, VENTURA P. KRUTZ, JR (av)
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Belczyk, David)
April 9, 2019 CARBIDE CONSULTANTS COMPANY, LLC, CATHAY RESOURCES CORP., CATHAY RESOURCES INC., GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION, and VENTURA P. KRUTZ, JR answer or other response to Amended Complaint #24 is due 5/15/19 (See Document No. #23 ). Text Only Entry: No PDF will issue. This text only entry constitutes the Court's Order or Notice on the matter. (jg)
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against CATHAY RESOURCES INC., GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION, CATHAY RESOURCES CORP., CARBIDE CONSULTANTS COMPANY, LLC, and VENTURA P. KRUTZ, JR. filed by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC. (jg)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Courts shall file the Amended Complaint in the form attached as an exhibit to Plaintiff's Motion, at which time the Amended Complaint shall be deemed filed. Plaintiff shall serve forthwith the new parties Carbide Consultants Company, LLC and Mr. Ventura P. Krutz, Jr. The Court notes that counsel accepts service on behalf of the new party Cathay Resource Corp. No response is needed or required at this time for claims asserted by General Carbide Corporation in its Answer to the initial Complaint. Any responsive pleadings or motions will be due 21 days after General Carbide Corporation's answer to the Amended Complaint. Responsive pleadings or motions to the Amended Complaint for Defendants General Carbide Corporation and Cathay Resources Inc. as well as new parties Carbide Consultants Company, LLC, Mr. Ventura P. Krutz, Jr., and Cathay Resources Corp. will be due on 5/15/19. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/9/19. (jg)
April 8, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (filed jointly pursuant to meet and confer) filed by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Belczyk, David)
April 2, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION. CHRISTOPHER W. KOLB served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit)) (McKinley, Christina)
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A Patter on behalf of GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION. (Patter, Julie)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Add New Parties: Responses to said Motion due by 4/9/19. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/2/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Belczyk, David)
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 Third Party Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER W. KOLB (ept)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION. (McKinley, Christina)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Christopher W. Kolb, and COUNTERCLAIM against CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC by GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Third-Party Summons) (McKinley, Christina)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CATHAY RESOURCES INC. Answer due from CATHAY RESOURCES INC. on 4/19/2019. (Lloyd, Bethann)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Kathleen M. Kundar, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cathay Resources Inc. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #11 MOTION for attorney Kathleen M. Kundar to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5076372) by CATHAY RESOURCES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lloyd, Bethann)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Kathleen M. Kundar to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5076372) by CATHAY RESOURCES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lloyd, Bethann)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CATHAY RESOURCES INC.. (Lloyd, Bethann)
March 22, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 3/29/2019. (ept)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethann R. Lloyd on behalf of CATHAY RESOURCES INC.. (Lloyd, Bethann)
March 11, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC. GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (ept)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC (Belczyk, David) Wrong event selected. Document removed from public view and redocketed at #8 . Modified text on 3/11/2019. (ept)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, NOTICE, ORDER served on CATHAY RESOURCES, INC. on 3/6/2019, filed by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC. (Belczyk, David)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/5/19. (jg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC. (ept)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CATHAY RESOURCES INC., GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION. (ept)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CATHAY RESOURCES INC., GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5050858), filed by CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons General Carbide Corporation, #3 Summons Cathay Resources Inc.) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC v. GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: Alex M. Lacey
Represented By: Julie A Patter
Represented By: Christina Manfredi McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARBIDE CONCEPTS COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: David M Belczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHAY RESOURCES INC.
Represented By: Bethann R. Lloyd
Represented By: Kathleen Kundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHAY RESOURCES CORP.
Represented By: Bethann R. Lloyd
Represented By: Kathleen Kundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VENTURA P. KRUTZ, JR.
Represented By: Alex M. Lacey
Represented By: Julie A Patter
Represented By: Christina Manfredi McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARBIDE CONSULTANTS COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Alex M. Lacey
Represented By: Julie A Patter
Represented By: Christina Manfredi McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CHRISTOPHER W. KOLB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?