POPA v. HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ASHLEY POPA
Defendant: HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. and NAVISTONE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00450
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Referring Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER OF COURT. In light of the entry of the Order Amending Case Management Order, the post-discovery status conference previously scheduled for 10/01/20 at 10:00 AM is CANCELED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/22/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING #81 Motion to Amend Case Management Order. Discovery due by 10/23/2020;, Summary Judgment due by 11/13/2020; Response to Summary Judgment due by 12/14/2020; Reply brief due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/22/20. (eca)
September 21, 2020 Filing 81 Consent MOTION to Amend #69 Case Management Order,, by ASHLEY POPA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Iverson, Kelly)
September 15, 2020 Filing 80 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #77 Motion for Protective Order, filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Iverson, Kelly)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order VACATING #78 Order Granting Motion for Bifurcation. The motion will remain open pending the filing of a response. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/10/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING #77 Motion for Bifurcation of Discovery. Discovery on the merits of Plaintiff's individual claims shall close on 12/30/20; Summary Judgment on the same due by 10/30/20; Responses due by 11/30/20; Reply briefs due by 12/14/20. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/10/20. (eca)
September 8, 2020 Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Bifurcating Discovery by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Hadrick, Rachel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman. Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/31/2020. (Court Reporter: None) (eca)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Status Conference is scheduled for 8/31/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge William S. Stickman. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to manage the call and to contact chambers at 412-208-7390 once all parties are connected. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/25/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
May 17, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 20, 2020 Filing 74 REPORT of Mediation: Case has not been resolved. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 4/17/2020. (White, David)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/03/20. (eca)
April 3, 2020 Filing 72 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order by ASHLEY POPA. (Lynch, Gary) Modified text on 4/3/2020. (eca)
March 28, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania (WDPA) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found at #here . Currently, multiple attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WDPA e-filing attorneys once the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to the e-filing account. If you have an upgraded PACER account, no action is required until after the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on May 26, 2020. You have an upgraded PACER account if you (1) e-file in another NextGen court, or (2) created your PACER account after August 10, 2014. If neither of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WDPA CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Further informational notices will be sent later, but if you have questions about upgrading your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
March 3, 2020 Filing 71 Notice of Mediation by DAVID B. WHITE. Mediation Date April 17, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. (White, David)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. David B. White is appointed as mediator. Mediation to occur by 04/17/20. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/30/20. (eca)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 02/28/20; Joinder of Parties due 02/28/20; Expert Reports by 07/30/20; Rebuttal Reports by 08/31/20; Discovery ends 09/30/20; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/01/20 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9B; Fee records due by the 28th of each month; First disclosure due by 02/28/20; Summary Judgment due by 10/30/20; Response to Summary Judgment due by 11/30/20; Reply brief due by 12/14/20; Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/30/20. (eca)
January 30, 2020 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/30/2020. (Court Reporter: None) (eca)
January 21, 2020 Filing 67 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by ASHLEY POPA. (Iverson, Kelly)
January 21, 2020 Filing 66 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Iverson, Kelly)
January 15, 2020 Filing 65 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint, by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Thomas, Emily)
January 15, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint, by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Pollock-Avery on behalf of ASHLEY POPA. (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2019 Defendants have through 01/15/20 to answer amended complaint. (eca)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING #61 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer to Amended Complaint due by 1/15/20. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 1/13/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 1/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/19/19. (rgm)
December 18, 2019 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #38 Amended Complaint, filed by ASHLEY POPA and Motion for One-week extension of time to Conduct Rule 26 Meeting and File Rule 26 Report by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dettmer Slye, Carrie)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 1/6/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 1/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/06/19. (eca)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER DENYING #42 and #45 Motions to Dismiss as to Count I and GRANTING as to Count II. #43 Request for Judicial Notice is DENIED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/06/19. (eca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY In Support to #45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Thomas, Emily)
August 26, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY BRIEF re #27 Declaration, #54 Objections, #28 Declaration, #43 Notice filed by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 56 BRIEF in Support re #42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William S. Stickman for all further proceedings. Judge Peter J. Phipps no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 08/26/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
August 12, 2019 Filing 54 OBJECTIONS to #27 Declaration, #28 Declaration, #43 Notice by ASHLEY POPA. (Iverson, Kelly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 53 BRIEF in Opposition re #42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Iverson, Kelly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Iverson, Kelly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 51 BRIEF in Opposition re #45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Iverson, Kelly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Iverson, Kelly)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #48 Motion to Revise Briefing Schedule. Responses to Motions to Dismiss due by 8/12/2019, Replies due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 07/25/19. (eca)
July 24, 2019 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Modify (Revise) Briefing Schedule #46 Brief in Support of Motion, #45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #44 Brief in Support of Motion by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hadrick, Rachel)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 46 BRIEF in Support re #45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Thomas, Emily)
July 22, 2019 Filing 45 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thomas, Emily)
July 22, 2019 Filing 44 BRIEF in Support re #42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Request to take Judicial Notice by NAVISTONE, INC. re #42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hadrick, Rachel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's First Amended Class Complaint by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hadrick, Rachel)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants shall Answer by 07/22/19; Plaintiff shall until 08/05/19 to file Response to Motion to Dismiss; Reply briefs due by 08/19/19. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/01/19. (eca)
June 28, 2019 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #38 Amended Complaint, filed by ASHLEY POPA and to Set Briefing Schedule by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hadrick, Rachel)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF COURT. In light of the filing of #38 Amended Complaint, #26 Motion to Dismiss, #29 Motion Requesting Judicial Notice, and #31 Motion to Dismiss are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 06/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
June 24, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC., NAVISTONE, INC. HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. answer due 7/8/2019; NAVISTONE, INC. answer due 7/8/2019, filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - D) (Lynch, Gary)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Order granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file her Amended Complaint by June 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 06/19/2019. (atg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by ASHLEY POPA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary)
June 5, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly K. Iverson on behalf of ASHLEY POPA. (Iverson, Kelly)
May 31, 2019 Filing 34 Errata re #30 Brief in Support of Motion, by NAVISTONE, INC.. Reason for Correction: Correction to Text on Page 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Hadrick, Rachel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 33 Proposed Order re #29 Motion Requesting Judicial Notice by NAVISTONE, INC. (Hadrick, Rachel) Modified text on 5/31/2019. (cel)
May 30, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #29 Motion Requesting Judicial Notice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 32 BRIEF in Support re #31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Thomas, Emily)
May 29, 2019 Filing 31 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thomas, Emily)
May 29, 2019 Filing 30 ERROR: DOCUMENT CORRECTED; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; BRIEF in Support re #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NAVISTONE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hadrick, Rachel) Modified text on 5/31/2019. (cel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION Requesting Judicial Notice re #26 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by NAVISTONE, INC. by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION re #26 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NAVISTONE, INC. Affiant: Thomas White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hadrick, Rachel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION re #26 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NAVISTONE, INC. Affiant: William M. Garbose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hadrick, Rachel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 26 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hadrick, Rachel)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 Joint Motion to Substitute Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 05/21/19. (eca)
May 20, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Modify Substitute Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC., NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hadrick, Rachel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Thomas, Emily)
May 13, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ASHLEY POPA. (Iverson, Kelly)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Carrie Dettmer Slye to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 05/09/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 05/09/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
May 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Carrie Dettmer Slye to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5129958) by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carrie Dettmer Slye, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Dettmer Slye, Carrie)
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5126326) by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Washington Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Karlsgodt, Paul)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for David W. Bertoni to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 04/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Order re #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David W. Bertoni, Lead Counsel by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Bertoni, David)
April 25, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney David W. Bertoni to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5111999) by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David W. Bertoni, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Bertoni, David)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Eamonn Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 04/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Devin J. Chwastyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 04/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for David Swetnam-Burland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 04/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Eamonn Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice, On Behalf of NaviStone, Inc. (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5110968) by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Eamonn Hart Bar Status, #3 Exhibit Eamonn Hart Certificate of Good Standing) (Hart, Eamonn)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Devin J. Chwastyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5110856) by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Devin J. Chwastyk in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit) (Chwastyk, Devin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. Answer due from HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. on 5/29/2019. (Thomas, Emily)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by NAVISTONE, INC. Answer due from NAVISTONE, INC. on 5/29/2019. (Hadrick, Rachel)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney David Swetnam-Burland to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5110268) by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Swetnam-Burland, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of David Swetnam-Burland, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of David Swetnam-Burland) (Swetnam-Burland, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Thomas, Emily)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily B. Thomas on behalf of HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Thomas, Emily)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF COURT. By May 13, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 04/22/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Lawrence County, case number 10248-19 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5105595) filed by NAVISTONE, INC., HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POPA v. HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY POPA
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Kelly K. Iverson
Represented By: Elizabeth Pollock-Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.
Represented By: Emily B. Thomas
Represented By: Carrie H. Dettmer Slye
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVISTONE, INC.
Represented By: Rachel R. Hadrick
Represented By: Eamonn Hart
Represented By: Devin J. Chwastyk
Represented By: David Swetnam-Burland
Represented By: David W. Bertoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?