COMMUNITY BANK v. FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY BANK
Defendant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00512
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for James A. Willhite, Jr., Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 5/29/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney James A. Willhite, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, w supportive Aff to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5154538) by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Willhite, James)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, a Florida corporation, is 100% wholly-owned subsidiary of Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation; which in turn is a subsidiary of FNTG Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; which is a subsidiary of Fidelity National Financial, Inc., a publicly traded, Delaware corporation. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Willhite, James)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Willhite on behalf of FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Willhite, James)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMUNITY BANK. FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Barron, Justin)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. O'Keefe, Jr on behalf of COMMUNITY BANK. (O'Keefe, John)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (av)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COMMUNITY BANK. (sdp)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 5/3/19. (jg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5123639), filed by COMMUNITY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMUNITY BANK v. FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY BANK
Represented By: Justin T. Barron
Represented By: John R. O'Keefe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: James A Willhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?